Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2953758

EP2953758 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SOLDER RECOVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EVS Int Ltd
Unit 17 Broadfield Park
Seaview Road
Cowes
Isle of Wight P031 7US / GB
[2015/51]
Inventor(s)01 / ATUL, Limaye
230 Rajendra Society
Sahakarnagar No 2
Maharashtra Pune 411009 / IN
02 / SUNILDUTTA, Jog
Plot No 4
Shri Sadguru NIwas Hsh Soc
Manik Baug
Vadgaon Brudruk
Maharashtra Pune 411051 / IN
03 / NORMAN, Simon Garve
45 Marinus
Medina Road
Cowes Isle of Wight Hampshire PO31 7XF / GB
 [2015/51]
Representative(s)Bradley, Adrian , et al
Cleveland LLP
10 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BR / GB
[2015/51]
Application number, filing date14702832.803.02.2014
[2015/51]
WO2014EP52065
Priority number, dateIN2013MUM32805.02.2013         Original published format: IN 328MU2013
[2017/16]
Former [2015/51]INMM0328201305.02.2013
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014122100
Date:14.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2953758
Date:16.12.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2014
[2015/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:B23K3/08
[2015/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/51]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR LÖTSTOFFRÜCKGEWINNUNG[2015/51]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SOLDER RECOVERY[2015/51]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCUPÉRATION DE BRASURE[2015/51]
Entry into regional phase02.09.2015National basic fee paid 
02.09.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
02.09.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.09.2015Examination requested  [2015/51]
14.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.09.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]US2003136816  (MCDONALD DAVID M [US]) [X] 1-5,9-11,13-16 * paragraphs [0035] , [0 36]; figures 2, 3 *;
 [I]US2010187732  (INUMA TAKEHIRO [JP]) [I] 1-11,13,16 * paragraphs [0044] - [0060]; figure 2 *;
 [I]US2002027157  (TAKANO HIROSHI [MY] ET AL) [I] 1-5,9-11,13,16 * paragraphs [0015] - [0021]; figure 2 *;
 [I]US6464929  (GROTEKE DANIEL E [US]) [I] 1-7,12-16 * column 7, line 49 - column 10, line 50; figures 1-4 *
by applicantUS2010187732
 WO9525823