Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2946434

EP2946434 - FEED NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.11.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
[N/P]
Former [2017/07]For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn PA 19312 / US
Former [2015/48]For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BISHOP, Bruce, Foster
1650 Cox Road
Aptos, CA 95003 / US
02 / FASENFEST, Kathleen
35199 Garcia Street
Union City, CA 94587 / US
 [2015/48]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/48]Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London
W6 0LE / GB
Application number, filing date14703476.315.01.2014
[2015/48]
WO2014US11632
Priority number, dateUS201361752931P15.01.2013         Original published format: US 201361752931 P
US20131384035515.03.2013         Original published format: US201313840355
[2015/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014113443
Date:24.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2946434
Date:25.11.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2014
[2015/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01P5/10, H01P5/12
[2015/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/48]
TitleGerman:SPEISENETZWERK[2015/48]
English:FEED NETWORK[2015/48]
French:RÉSEAU DE LIAISONS DE CONNEXION[2015/48]
Entry into regional phase02.07.2015National basic fee paid 
02.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/48]
29.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.11.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.03.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5572172  (STANDKE RANDOLPH E [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-12 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 10 * * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 9; figures 7,8 * * column 6, line 30 - column 7, line 40; figures 11,12 * * column 8, line 28 - line 59; figures 14,15 *;
 [Y]WO2009077791  (BAE SYSTEMS PLC [GB]; LEWIS GARETH MICHAEL [GB]; PANAGHISTON GARY DAVI) [Y] 1-12 * page 8, line 8 - page 9, line 16; figures 4,5 *;
 [A]EP1703582  (TDK CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0032]; figure 6 *;
 [A]US4375054  (PAVIO ANTHONY M) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2009309672  (YEUNG LAP-KUN [US] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029]; figures 7A-8C *;
 [A]EP1195841  (INST DE ASTROFISICA DE CANARIA [ES]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0033]; figures 5-7 * * paragraph [0037] *;
 [A]JP2012114624  (NEC CORP) [A] 1-12 * abstract *