Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2956535

EP2956535 - INDUSTRIAL AND INSTITUTIONAL LAUNDERING USING MULTI-ENZYME COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.02.2019  [2019/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novozymes A/S
Krogshoejvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
[2015/52]
Inventor(s)01 / CHRISTENSEN, Christian, Ausig
Ewaldsbakken 7A
DK-2900 Hellerup / DK
 [2015/52]
Representative(s)NZ EPO Representatives
Krogshoejvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
[N/P]
Application number, filing date14704124.811.02.2014
[2015/52]
WO2014EP52616
Priority number, dateEP2013015519214.02.2013         Original published format: EP 13155192
[2015/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2014124927
Date:21.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/34]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2956535
Date:23.12.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2014
[2015/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/386, C11D11/00
[2015/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/52]
TitleGerman:INDUSTRIELLE UND INSTITUTIONELLE WASCHVERFAHREN MIT MULTIENZYMZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2015/52]
English:INDUSTRIAL AND INSTITUTIONAL LAUNDERING USING MULTI-ENZYME COMPOSITIONS[2015/52]
French:BLANCHISSAGE INDUSTRIEL ET INSTITUTIONNEL UTILISANT DES COMPOSITIONS MULTIENZYMATIQUES[2015/52]
Entry into regional phase14.09.2015National basic fee paid 
14.09.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
14.09.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.09.2015Examination requested  [2015/52]
13.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.08.2018Observations by third parties
01.09.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/06]
28.09.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201805   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2008101958  (NOVOZYMES AS [DK]) [X] 12-15 * page 2, lines 6-14 * * page 3, line 8 - page 6, line 5 * * page 10, line 31 - page 13, line 18 * * example -; claim - * [I] 1-15;
 [I]US2004063597  (ADAIR MATHA J [US] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0066] - [0078] - [0197] - [0201]; example -; claim - *;
 [XI]US2010120651  (DALE DOUGLAS A [US] ET AL) [X] 12-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0042] - [0052] - [0064] - [0066]; example -; claim - * [I] 1-15;
 [XI]WO2009019075  (UNILEVER PLC [GB]; UNILEVER NV [NL]; UNILEVER HINDUSTAN [IN]) [X] 12-15 * page 3, line 6 - page 14, line 28; example -; claim - * [I] 1-15