Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2946512

EP2946512 - FEC-BASED RELIABLE TRANSPORT CONTROL PROTOCOLS FOR MULTIPATH STREAMING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.03.2018
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2015/48]
Inventor(s)01 / LUBY, Michael George
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / MINDER, Lorenz Christoph
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2015/48]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/48]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date14704212.117.01.2014
[2015/48]
WO2014US11988
Priority number, dateUS201361753884P17.01.2013         Original published format: US 201361753884 P
US201361818106P01.05.2013         Original published format: US 201361818106 P
US20141415729016.01.2014         Original published format: US201414157290
[2015/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014113636
Date:24.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2946512
Date:25.11.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2014
[2015/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/06, H04L1/18
[2015/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/48]
TitleGerman:ZUVERLÄSSIGE FEC-BASIERTE TRANSPORTKONTROLLPROTOKOLLE FÜR MEHRWEG-STREAMING[2015/48]
English:FEC-BASED RELIABLE TRANSPORT CONTROL PROTOCOLS FOR MULTIPATH STREAMING[2015/48]
French:PROTOCOLES DE COMMANDE DE TRANSPORT FIABLES À BASE DE FEC POUR LA DIFFUSION EN FLUX CONTINU PAR CHEMINS MULTIPLES[2015/48]
Entry into regional phase02.07.2015National basic fee paid 
02.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.11.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/48]
04.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.03.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
09.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
08.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201906   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2005036361  (DIGITAL FOUNTAIN INC [US]; LUBY MICHAEL [US]; DOUCLEFF MATT [US]; WIGD) [Y] 2-10,12-22 * page 2, lines 21-30 * * page 4, lines 5-10 * * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 9 * * page 13, line 9 - page 18, line 22 * * page 20, line 27 - page 21, line 32 * * page 25, line 24 - page 27, line 17 *;
 [A]WO2012018339  (THOMSON LICENSING [FR]; WU ZHENYU [US]) [A] 1-22 * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 10 * * page 8, lines 1-27 * * page 10, lines 15-20 *;
 [AD]US2003058958  (SHOKROLLAHI M AMIN [US] ET AL) [AD] 1-22 * paragraphs [0048] - [0051] - [0 55] , [0 57] *;
 [A]US2012207068  (WATSON MARK [US] ET AL) [A] 1-22 * paragraphs [0046] , [0 51] - [0052] *;
 [XPA]US2013195106  (CALMON FLAVIO DU PIN [US] ET AL) [XP] 1,11 * paragraphs [0004] - [0018] - [0 45] - [0061] - [0064] - [0069] - [0073] , [0075] , [0087] , [0093] , [0094] * [A] 2,10,12-22
 [XY]  - YONG CUI ET AL, "FMTCP: A Fountain Code-Based Multipath Transmission Control Protocol", DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING SYSTEMS (ICDCS), 2012 IEEE 32ND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20120618), doi:10.1109/ICDCS.2012.23, ISBN 978-1-4577-0295-2, pages 366 - 375, XP032217879 [X] 1,11 * Sections I-V * [Y] 2-10,12-22

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDCS.2012.23
by applicantUS6307487
 US6320520
 US6373406
 US6614366
 US6411223
 US6486803
 US2003058958
 US7447235