Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2946512


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.12.2019 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  01.01.2020 [2020/01]
28.08.2019 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
07.03.2019 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
17.07.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.03.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.03.2018 First examination report
16.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.03.2016 Change - extension states published on  20.04.2016  [2016/16]
07.03.2016 Amendment by applicant
13.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.10.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.11.2015  [2015/48]
23.10.2015 Request for examination filed published on  25.11.2015  [2015/48]
29.07.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
07.07.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
03.07.2015 Change - representative
03.07.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
02.12.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
06.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
25.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
20.02.2014 PCT data prior to European publication