Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2956421

EP2956421 - SOLAR CONTROL GLAZING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.05.2018
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AGC Glass Europe
Avenue Jean Monnet, 4
1348 Louvain-La-Neuve / BE
[2015/52]
Inventor(s)01 / MAHIEU, Stijn
Vijverstraat 32
B-9920 Lovendegem / BE
02 / DUSOULIER, Laurent
Rue des Platanes 10
B-4880 Aubel / BE
 [2015/52]
Representative(s)Agustsson, Sveinn Otto , et al
AGC Glass Europe S.A.
Rue Louis Blériot, 12
6041 Gosselies / BE
[N/P]
Former [2015/52]Larangé, Françoise , et al
AGC Glass Europe
Technovation Centre
IP Department
Rue Louis Blériot, 12
6041 Gosselies / BE
Application number, filing date14704590.014.02.2014
[2015/52]
WO2014EP52941
Priority number, dateBE2013000010014.02.2013         Original published format: BE 201300100
EP2013017399127.06.2013         Original published format: EP 13173991
[2015/52]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014125081
Date:21.08.2014
Language:FR
[2014/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2956421
Date:23.12.2015
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2014
[2015/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:C03C17/36, E06B3/66
[2015/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/52]
TitleGerman:SONNENSCHUTZVERGLASUNG[2015/52]
English:SOLAR CONTROL GLAZING[2015/52]
French:VITRAGE DE CONTRÔLE SOLAIRE[2015/52]
Entry into regional phase14.09.2015National basic fee paid 
14.09.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
14.09.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.09.2015Examination requested  [2015/52]
18.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.05.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[I]DE3543178  (LEYBOLD HERAEUS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [I] 1,2,9-13,16-22,26 * claim 1 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO2012095380  (AGC GLASS EUROPE [BE]; DUSOULIER LAURENT [BE]) [A] 1-26 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US2006046089  (O'SHAUGHNESSY DENNIS J [US] ET AL) [A] 1-26 * claim 1 *;
 [A]WO2006134335  (PILKINGTON PLC [GB]; ERSOY AYSE [GB]; BILLINGE EMMA [GB]; JONES CLAIRE) [A] 1-26 * claim 1 *