Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2956732

EP2956732 - UNIVERSAL RIFLESCOPE MOUNT FOR HAND-HELD WEAPONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.01.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dentler, Daniel
Burgstrasse 19
88229 Leutkirch / DE
[2015/52]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2015/52]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10
88131 Lindau / DE
[2015/52]
Application number, filing date14705021.523.01.2014
[2015/52]
WO2014EP00163
Priority number, dateDE2013100260615.02.2013         Original published format: DE102013002606
[2015/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014124728
Date:21.08.2014
Language:DE
[2014/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2956732
Date:23.12.2015
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2014
[2015/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2956732
Date:09.05.2018
Language:DE
[2018/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:F41G1/41, F41G11/00
[2015/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:UNIVERSELLE ZIELFERNROHRMONTAGE FÜR HANDFEUERWAFFEN[2015/52]
English:UNIVERSAL RIFLESCOPE MOUNT FOR HAND-HELD WEAPONS[2015/52]
French:SYSTÈME UNIVERSEL DE MONTAGE DE LUNETTES DE VISÉE POUR ARMES À FEU DE POING[2015/52]
Entry into regional phase04.08.2015National basic fee paid 
04.08.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
04.08.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.08.2015Examination requested  [2015/52]
08.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.02.2018Fee for grant paid
21.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.06.2017
Opposition(s)12.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
NL09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
SI09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/11]CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
NL09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/10]CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
NL09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
NL09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
NL09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2018/52]HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
NL09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2018/51]HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
Former [2018/50]HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
Former [2018/49]LT09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
Former [2018/47]LT09.05.2018
NO09.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[XI]US7647720  (VENDETTI VINCENT J [US]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * column 1, lines 15-18 * * column 1, lines 47-58 * * column 2, lines 42-57 * * column 3, lines 1-24 * * column 5, lines 11-20 * * column 5, lines 21-27 * * column 5, lines 48-50 * * figures 1,2,6 * * claim 1 * [I] 8-10;
 [XI]US8296991  (CHUNG SUNG GIU [US]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * column 2, lines 16-30 * * column 5, lines 5-23 * * figure 1 * [I] 8-10;
 [XI]US2013008073  (CLIFTON BUDDY G [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0006] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0017] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0024] * * figures 1,4,5 * [I] 8-10;
 [XI]US8240075  (MULLIN JAMES K [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * * column 1, lines 10-12 * * column 3, lines 6-8 * * column 6, lines 7-9 * * column 6, lines 14-24 * * column 6, lines 30-37 * * column 6, lines 44-56 * * column 7, lines 15-22 * * column 7, lines 35-53 * * figures 1-2 * * figures 3,5,8 * [I] 8-10;
 [A]US2012085014  (RILEY LOUIS F [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0018] , [0019] * * figures 2,8,9 *
ExaminationUS7647720
by applicantDE202011002180U
 US2576007
 US6591538
 US2011099877