Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2969990

EP2969990 - WINDOW COMPRISING A SOLAR CONTROL COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/03]GLASS PANEL COMPRISING A SOLAR CONTROL LAYER
[2016/35]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK, PL
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AGC Glass Europe
Avenue Jean Monnet, 4
1348 Louvain-La-Neuve / BE
[2016/03]
Inventor(s)01 / MAHIEU, Stijn
Vijverstraat 32
B-9920 Lovendegem / BE
02 / DUSOULIER, Laurent
Rue des Platanes 10
B-4880 Aubel / BE
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Agustsson, Sveinn Otto , et al
AGC Glass Europe S.A.
Rue Louis Blériot, 12
6041 Gosselies / BE
[N/P]
Former [2016/03]Larangé, Françoise
AGC Glass Europe
Technovation Centre
IP Department
Rue Louis Blériot, 12
6041 Gosselies / BE
Application number, filing date14705125.414.02.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014EP52943
Priority number, dateBE2013000016814.03.2013         Original published format: BE 201300168
EP2013017399227.06.2013         Original published format: EP 13173992
[2016/03]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014139755
Date:18.09.2014
Language:FR
[2014/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2969990
Date:20.01.2016
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014
[2016/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2969990
Date:01.02.2017
Language:FR
[2017/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:C03C17/36
[2016/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FENSTER ENTHALTEND EINE SONNENSCHUTZBESCHICHTUNG[2016/35]
English:WINDOW COMPRISING A SOLAR CONTROL COATING[2016/35]
French:VITRAGE COMPORTANT UNE COUCHE DE CONTRÔLE SOLAIRE[2016/03]
Former [2016/03]GLASSCHEIBE MIT EINEM SONNENKONTROLLSCHICHT
Former [2016/03]GLASS PANEL COMPRISING A SOLAR CONTROL LAYER
Entry into regional phase14.10.2015National basic fee paid 
14.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
14.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
27.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.12.2016Fee for grant paid
12.12.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.12.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.08.2016
Opposition(s)03.11.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.02.2017
CY01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
MK01.02.2017
MT01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
IE14.02.2017
PL14.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/47]AT01.02.2017
CY01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
MT01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
IE14.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2018/43]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
MT01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
IE14.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2018/34]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
IE14.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2018/13]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
IE14.02.2017
LU14.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2018/09]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
LU14.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2018/04]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
LU14.02.2017
HU15.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/51]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
HU15.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/50]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
HU15.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/49]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/48]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/41]AT01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2012225316  (IMRAN MUHAMMAD [US] ET AL) [X] 1,18,19,25 * abstract * * figures 1,12 * * paragraphs [0045] - [0076] - [0084] * [I] 2-17,20-24;
 [XI]US2012225304  (IMRAN MUHAMMAD [US] ET AL) [X] 1,18,19,25 * abstract * * figures 1,12 * * paragraphs [0045] - [0076] - [0084] * [I] 2-17,20-24;
 [XI]US2012225317  (IMRAN MUHAMMAD [US] ET AL) [X] 1,18,19,25 * abstract * * figures 1,12 * * paragraphs [0045] - [0076] - [0084] * [I] 2-17,20-24;
 [A]US7582356  (BROCHOT JEAN-PIERRE [FR] ET AL) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2006222863  (NADAUD NICOLAS [FR] ET AL) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *;
 [A]US7090921  (STACHOWIAK GRZEGORZ [US]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2012308811  (ROQUINY PHILIPPE [BE] ET AL) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *
 [A]  - KAMIL ZUBER ET AL, "Enhanced abrasion resistance of ultrathin reflective coatings on polymeric substrates: An improvement upon glass substrates", WEAR, (20130101), vol. 297, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/j.wear.2012.11.050, ISSN 0043-1648, pages 986 - 991, XP055075519 [A] 1-25 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.wear.2012.11.050