Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2969990


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.12.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.01.2020  [2020/01]
22.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.12.2019  [2019/52]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
20.07.2018 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
26.01.2018 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
22.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.01.2018  [2018/04]
08.12.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
27.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
29.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
15.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
08.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
04.09.2017 Change - representative
30.12.2016 (Expected) grant published on  01.02.2017  [2017/05]
16.12.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
16.12.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
14.12.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
21.08.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.07.2016 Change - German title published on  31.08.2016  [2016/35]
29.07.2016 Change - English title published on  31.08.2016  [2016/35]
20.05.2016 Change - extension states published on  22.06.2016  [2016/25]
30.04.2016 Amendment by applicant
02.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.12.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  20.01.2016  [2016/03]
18.12.2015 Request for examination filed published on  20.01.2016  [2016/03]
29.10.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
16.10.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
26.08.2015 Change - representative
26.08.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
27.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
29.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
26.02.2014 PCT data prior to European publication