Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2962072

EP2962072 - BATTERY-LESS SIGNAL TRANSMITTER WITH WIEGAND SENSOR FOR GAS OR WATER METERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hengstler GmbH
Uhlandstrasse 49
78554 Aldingen / DE
[2016/01]
Inventor(s)01 / EFIMOV, George
Kastellstrasse 18
78628 Rottweil / DE
02 / MIXNER, Michael
Römerstrasse 11
78504 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
 [2016/01]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
[2016/01]
Application number, filing date14705704.625.01.2014
[2016/01]
WO2014EP00202
Priority number, dateDE2013100319026.02.2013         Original published format: DE102013003190
[2016/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014131486
Date:04.09.2014
Language:DE
[2014/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2962072
Date:06.01.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2014
[2016/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2962072
Date:22.03.2017
Language:DE
[2017/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:G01F1/60, G01F15/06
[2016/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BATTERIELOSER SIGNALGEBER MIT WIEGAND-SENSOR FÜR GAS- ODER WASSERZÄHLER[2016/01]
English:BATTERY-LESS SIGNAL TRANSMITTER WITH WIEGAND SENSOR FOR GAS OR WATER METERS[2016/01]
French:CAPTEUR DE SIGNAUX SANS BATTERIE POURVU D'UN CAPTEUR WIEGAND POUR COMPTEURS DE GAZ OU D'EAU[2016/01]
Entry into regional phase17.08.2015National basic fee paid 
17.08.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
17.08.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.08.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.08.2015Examination requested  [2016/01]
21.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.01.2017Fee for grant paid
13.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.10.2016
Opposition(s)02.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
MT22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
[2019/30]
Former [2018/43]CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MT22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/14]CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/09]CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2017/51]CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2017/50]CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
Former [2017/49]CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
Former [2017/41]FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
Cited inInternational search[ID]US6612188  (HAMILTON DAVID [US]) [ID] 1-10 * column 2, line 35 - line 63 * * column 3, line 56 * * column 6, line 31 *;
 [A]WO2012092940  (MEHNERT WALTER [DE]; THEIL THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 4, paragraph 3 * * figure 1 * * page 9, paragraph 6 * * page 10, paragraph 3 * * page 11, paragraph 3 *;
 [A]US2006076948  (GUTIERREZ FRANCISCO [US] GUTIERREZ FRANCISCO M [US]) [A] 1-10;
 [AD]DE10259223  (MEHNERT WALTER [DE]; THEIL THOMAS [DE]) [AD] 1-10;
 [A]DE19714351  (RMG GASELAN REGEL & MESSTECHNIK GMBH) [A] 1-10
by applicantUS6612188
 DE10259223
 EP0658745