blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2875506

EP2875506 - A SOUND ABSORBING MEANS CONTAINING AT LEAST ONE CAVITY RESONATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.09.2022
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.10.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.08.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Technicka Univerzita v Liberci
Studentska 1402/2
461 17 Liberec 1 / CZ
[N/P]
Former [2015/22]For all designated states
Technicka Univerzita v Liberci
Studentska 2
461 17 Liberec / CZ
Inventor(s)01 / KALINOVA, Klara
Svahova 818
46802 Rychnov u Jablonce nad Nisou / CZ
02 / KOLEK, Ondrej
Dolni Cerna Studnice 97
46821 Pencin / CZ
 [2015/22]
Representative(s)Musil, Dobroslav, et al
Zabrdovicka 801/11
615 00 Brno / CZ
[2015/22]
Application number, filing date14705963.816.01.2014
[2021/45]
WO2014CZ00008
Priority number, dateCZ2013000003518.01.2013         Original published format: CZ 20130035
[2015/22]
Filing languageCS
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2014111068
Date:24.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/30]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2875506
Date:27.05.2015
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2015/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2875506
Date:10.11.2021
Language:EN
[2021/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.11.2014
ClassificationIPC:G10K11/172
[2015/22]
CPC:
G10K11/172 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/22]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHALLDÄMPFENDE VORRICHTUNG MIT MINDESTENS EINEM HOHLRAUMRESONATOR[2015/22]
English:A SOUND ABSORBING MEANS CONTAINING AT LEAST ONE CAVITY RESONATOR[2015/22]
French:MOYENS D'ABSORPTION PHONIQUE CONTENANT AU MOINS UN RÉSONATEUR À CAVITÉ[2015/22]
Entry into regional phase20.02.2015National basic fee paid 
20.02.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
20.02.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/22]
25.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.05.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
04.10.2021Fee for grant paid
04.10.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.05.2017
Opposition(s)11.08.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2022/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
01.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
29.01.2020Renewal fee patent year 07
27.01.2021Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201704   M06   Fee paid on   23.02.2017
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.01.2014
AL10.11.2021
AT10.11.2021
CY10.11.2021
CZ10.11.2021
DK10.11.2021
EE10.11.2021
ES10.11.2021
FI10.11.2021
HR10.11.2021
IT10.11.2021
LT10.11.2021
LV10.11.2021
MC10.11.2021
NL10.11.2021
PL10.11.2021
RO10.11.2021
RS10.11.2021
SI10.11.2021
SK10.11.2021
SM10.11.2021
IE16.01.2022
LU16.01.2022
BE31.01.2022
CH31.01.2022
LI31.01.2022
BG10.02.2022
GB10.02.2022
NO10.02.2022
GR11.02.2022
IS10.03.2022
PT10.03.2022
DE02.08.2022
[2024/20]
Former [2024/18]HU16.01.2014
AL10.11.2021
AT10.11.2021
CZ10.11.2021
DK10.11.2021
EE10.11.2021
ES10.11.2021
FI10.11.2021
HR10.11.2021
IT10.11.2021
LT10.11.2021
LV10.11.2021
MC10.11.2021
NL10.11.2021
PL10.11.2021
RO10.11.2021
RS10.11.2021
SI10.11.2021
SK10.11.2021
SM10.11.2021
IE16.01.2022
LU16.01.2022
BE31.01.2022
CH31.01.2022
LI31.01.2022
BG10.02.2022
GB10.02.2022
NO10.02.2022
GR11.02.2022
IS10.03.2022
PT10.03.2022
DE02.08.2022
Former [2023/27]AL10.11.2021
AT10.11.2021
CZ10.11.2021
DK10.11.2021
EE10.11.2021
ES10.11.2021
FI10.11.2021
HR10.11.2021
IT10.11.2021
LT10.11.2021
LV10.11.2021
MC10.11.2021
NL10.11.2021
PL10.11.2021
RO10.11.2021
RS10.11.2021
SI10.11.2021
SK10.11.2021
SM10.11.2021
IE16.01.2022
LU16.01.2022
BE31.01.2022
CH31.01.2022
LI31.01.2022
BG10.02.2022
GB10.02.2022
NO10.02.2022
GR11.02.2022
IS10.03.2022
PT10.03.2022
DE02.08.2022
Former [2023/08]AL10.11.2021
AT10.11.2021
CZ10.11.2021
DK10.11.2021
EE10.11.2021
ES10.11.2021
FI10.11.2021
HR10.11.2021
LT10.11.2021
LV10.11.2021
MC10.11.2021
NL10.11.2021
PL10.11.2021
RO10.11.2021
RS10.11.2021
SI10.11.2021
SK10.11.2021
SM10.11.2021
IE16.01.2022
LU16.01.2022
BE31.01.2022
CH31.01.2022
LI31.01.2022
BG10.02.2022
GB10.02.2022
NO10.02.2022
GR11.02.2022
IS10.03.2022
PT10.03.2022
DE02.08.2022
Former [2023/03]AL10.11.2021
AT10.11.2021
CZ10.11.2021
DK10.11.2021
EE10.11.2021
ES10.11.2021
FI10.11.2021
HR10.11.2021
LT10.11.2021
LV10.11.2021
MC10.11.2021
NL10.11.2021
PL10.11.2021
RO10.11.2021
RS10.11.2021
SI10.11.2021
SK10.11.2021
SM10.11.2021
LU16.01.2022
BE31.01.2022
CH31.01.2022
LI31.01.2022
BG10.02.2022
NO10.02.2022
GR11.02.2022
IS10.03.2022
PT10.03.2022
DE02.08.2022
Former [2023/01]AL10.11.2021
AT10.11.2021
CZ10.11.2021
DK10.11.2021
EE10.11.2021
ES10.11.2021
FI10.11.2021
HR10.11.2021
LT10.11.2021
LV10.11.2021
MC10.11.2021
NL10.11.2021
PL10.11.2021
RO10.11.2021
RS10.11.2021
SI10.11.2021
SK10.11.2021
SM10.11.2021
LU16.01.2022
BE31.01.2022
BG10.02.2022
NO10.02.2022
GR11.02.2022
IS10.03.2022
PT10.03.2022
DE02.08.2022
Former [2022/49]AL10.11.2021
AT10.11.2021
CZ10.11.2021
DK10.11.2021
EE10.11.2021
ES10.11.2021
FI10.11.2021
HR10.11.2021
LT10.11.2021
LV10.11.2021
MC10.11.2021
NL10.11.2021
PL10.11.2021
RO10.11.2021
RS10.11.2021
SK10.11.2021
SM10.11.2021
LU16.01.2022
BG10.02.2022
NO10.02.2022
GR11.02.2022
IS10.03.2022
PT10.03.2022
DE02.08.2022
Former [2022/47]AT10.11.2021
CZ10.11.2021
DK10.11.2021
EE10.11.2021
ES10.11.2021
FI10.11.2021
HR10.11.2021
LT10.11.2021
LV10.11.2021
MC10.11.2021
NL10.11.2021
PL10.11.2021
RO10.11.2021
RS10.11.2021
SK10.11.2021
SM10.11.2021
LU16.01.2022
BG10.02.2022
NO10.02.2022
GR11.02.2022
IS10.03.2022
PT10.03.2022
DE02.08.2022
Former [2022/46]AT10.11.2021
CZ10.11.2021
DK10.11.2021
EE10.11.2021
ES10.11.2021
FI10.11.2021
HR10.11.2021
LT10.11.2021
LV10.11.2021
MC10.11.2021
NL10.11.2021
PL10.11.2021
RO10.11.2021
RS10.11.2021
SK10.11.2021
SM10.11.2021
LU16.01.2022
BG10.02.2022
NO10.02.2022
GR11.02.2022
IS10.03.2022
PT10.03.2022
Former [2022/39]AT10.11.2021
CZ10.11.2021
DK10.11.2021
EE10.11.2021
ES10.11.2021
FI10.11.2021
HR10.11.2021
LT10.11.2021
LV10.11.2021
MC10.11.2021
NL10.11.2021
PL10.11.2021
RO10.11.2021
RS10.11.2021
SK10.11.2021
SM10.11.2021
BG10.02.2022
NO10.02.2022
GR11.02.2022
IS10.03.2022
PT10.03.2022
Former [2022/35]AT10.11.2021
CZ10.11.2021
DK10.11.2021
EE10.11.2021
ES10.11.2021
FI10.11.2021
HR10.11.2021
LT10.11.2021
LV10.11.2021
NL10.11.2021
PL10.11.2021
RO10.11.2021
RS10.11.2021
SK10.11.2021
SM10.11.2021
BG10.02.2022
NO10.02.2022
GR11.02.2022
IS10.03.2022
PT10.03.2022
Former [2022/34]AT10.11.2021
EE10.11.2021
ES10.11.2021
FI10.11.2021
HR10.11.2021
LT10.11.2021
LV10.11.2021
NL10.11.2021
PL10.11.2021
RO10.11.2021
RS10.11.2021
SM10.11.2021
BG10.02.2022
NO10.02.2022
GR11.02.2022
IS10.03.2022
PT10.03.2022
Former [2022/33]AT10.11.2021
ES10.11.2021
FI10.11.2021
HR10.11.2021
LT10.11.2021
LV10.11.2021
NL10.11.2021
PL10.11.2021
RS10.11.2021
SM10.11.2021
BG10.02.2022
NO10.02.2022
GR11.02.2022
IS10.03.2022
PT10.03.2022
Former [2022/25]AT10.11.2021
ES10.11.2021
FI10.11.2021
HR10.11.2021
LT10.11.2021
LV10.11.2021
NL10.11.2021
PL10.11.2021
RS10.11.2021
BG10.02.2022
NO10.02.2022
GR11.02.2022
IS10.03.2022
PT10.03.2022
Former [2022/24]AT10.11.2021
ES10.11.2021
FI10.11.2021
HR10.11.2021
LT10.11.2021
LV10.11.2021
NL10.11.2021
PL10.11.2021
RS10.11.2021
BG10.02.2022
GR11.02.2022
IS10.03.2022
PT10.03.2022
Former [2022/23]AT10.11.2021
ES10.11.2021
FI10.11.2021
HR10.11.2021
LT10.11.2021
LV10.11.2021
PL10.11.2021
RS10.11.2021
BG10.02.2022
PT10.03.2022
Former [2022/22]AT10.11.2021
FI10.11.2021
LT10.11.2021
RS10.11.2021
BG10.02.2022
Former [2022/21]AT10.11.2021
RS10.11.2021
BG10.02.2022
Former [2022/19]BG10.02.2022
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0246464  (PAPE HANS [DE], et al) [X] 1,5-7 * page 9, line 9 - page 10, line 11 * [Y] 2-4,10;
 [Y]US5241512  (ARGY GILLES [FR], et al) [Y] 3,4* figure 6b *;
 [Y]US6220388  (SANBORN DAVID M [US]) [Y] 2,10 * column 7, line 65 - column 8, line 10; figure 1 *;
 [X]WO2012012044  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [X] 1,8,9 * page 11, line 5 - page 13, line 25 *
ExaminationWO2006108363
 WO2011047429
by applicantWO2006108363
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.