Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2954701

EP2954701 - AN AUDIO APPARATUS AND METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  21.04.2017
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.04.2017Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 24.05.2017  [2017/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2015/51]
Inventor(s)01 / HARMA, Aki Sakari
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / JELFS, Sam Martin
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
03 / DE BRUIJN, Werner Paulus Josephus
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2015/51]
Representative(s)Hekstra-Nowacka, Ewa Barbara
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/51]Hekstra-Nowacka, Ewa Barbara
Philips International B.V.
Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date14706102.227.01.2014
[2015/51]
WO2014IB58558
Priority number, dateUS201361760740P05.02.2013         Original published format: US 201361760740 P
[2015/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014122550
Date:14.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2954701
Date:16.12.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2014
[2015/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04S7/00
[2015/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/51]
TitleGerman:AUDIOVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR[2015/51]
English:AN AUDIO APPARATUS AND METHOD THEREFOR[2015/51]
French:APPAREIL AUDIO ET PROCÉDÉ CORRESPONDANT[2015/51]
Entry into regional phase07.09.2015National basic fee paid 
07.09.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
07.09.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.09.2015Examination requested  [2015/51]
14.04.2017Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2012057715  (JOHNSTON JAMES D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,20 * figures 1,2,4,5,10,12 * [Y] 8,11,19 [I] 3,5,7,9,10,12-18;
 [Y]US2003119523  (BULTHUIS WILLEM [US]) [Y] 8,19 * paragraph [0036]; figures 1, 2 *;
 [Y]US2009060236  (JOHNSTON JAMES D [US], et al) [Y] 11 * paragraphs [0003] - [0008]; figure 5 *
by applicantWO2011151771
    - PULKKI V., "Virtual Source Positioning Using Vector Base Amplitude Panning", J. AUDIO ENG. SOC., (199706), vol. 45, no. 6, pages 456 - 466, XP002719359