blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2875507

EP2875507 - A SOUND ABSORPTIVE ELEMENT COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE ACOUSTIC RESONANCE MEMBRANE FORMED BY A LAYER OF POLYMERIC NANOFIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.06.2019
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.02.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 03.08.2022  [2022/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Technicka Univerzita v Liberci
Studentska 1402/2
461 17 Liberec 1 / CZ
[N/P]
Former [2015/22]For all designated states
Technicka Univerzita v Liberci
Studentska 2
461 17 Liberec / CZ
Inventor(s)01 / KALINOVA, Klara
Svahova 818
46802 Rychnov u Jablonce nad Nisou / CZ
 [2015/22]
Representative(s)Musil, Dobroslav, et al
Zabrdovicka 801/11
615 00 Brno / CZ
[2015/22]
Application number, filing date14706277.216.01.2014
[2018/31]
WO2014CZ00007
Priority number, dateCZ2013000003418.01.2013         Original published format: CZ 20130034
[2015/22]
Filing languageCS
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2014111067
Date:24.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/30]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2875507
Date:27.05.2015
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2015/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2875507
Date:01.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.11.2014
ClassificationIPC:G10K11/172, G10K11/162
[2015/22]
CPC:
G10K11/172 (EP); E04B2001/8452 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/22]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHALLABSORBIERENDES ELEMENT MIT MINDESTENS EINER AUS EINER SCHICHT VON POLYMEREN GEFORMTEN NANOFASERAKUSTIKRESONANZMEMBRAN[2015/22]
English:A SOUND ABSORPTIVE ELEMENT COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE ACOUSTIC RESONANCE MEMBRANE FORMED BY A LAYER OF POLYMERIC NANOFIBERS[2015/22]
French:ÉLÉMENT ABSORBANT LES SONS COMPRENANT AU MOINS UNE MEMBRANE À RÉSONANCE ACOUSTIQUE FORMÉE PAR UNE COUCHE DE NANOFIBRES POLYMÈRES[2015/22]
Entry into regional phase20.02.2015National basic fee paid 
20.02.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
20.02.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/22]
25.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.10.2015Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
13.11.2015Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
10.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
17.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.06.2018Fee for grant paid
14.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.05.2017
Opposition(s)03.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
01.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201704   M06   Fee paid on   23.02.2017
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.01.2014
AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CY01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
MK01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
TR01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
PT01.12.2018
IE16.01.2019
LU16.01.2019
MT16.01.2019
BE31.01.2019
[2022/31]
Former [2021/32]HU16.01.2014
AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CY01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
TR01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
PT01.12.2018
IE16.01.2019
LU16.01.2019
MT16.01.2019
BE31.01.2019
Former [2021/26]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CY01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
TR01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
PT01.12.2018
IE16.01.2019
LU16.01.2019
MT16.01.2019
BE31.01.2019
Former [2020/29]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
TR01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
PT01.12.2018
IE16.01.2019
LU16.01.2019
MT16.01.2019
BE31.01.2019
Former [2020/16]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
TR01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
IE16.01.2019
LU16.01.2019
BE31.01.2019
Former [2020/09]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
IE16.01.2019
LU16.01.2019
BE31.01.2019
Former [2019/51]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
LU16.01.2019
BE31.01.2019
Former [2019/44]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
LU16.01.2019
Former [2019/40]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/37]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/23]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/21]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/11]AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/10]AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/09]FI01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
NO01.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NO01.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT01.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2007047263  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 12, line 25 - page 13, line 23; figure 2 *;
 [A]WO2008021455  (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 10, line 16 - page 11, line 10; figures 1-3 * * page 12, line 21 - page 13, line 15 *;
 [I]EP2214160  (AKSYS GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-18 * paragraphs [0029] - [0031] * * paragraph [0046]; figures 4-6 * * paragraphs [0049] - [0051]; figures 3, 4 * * paragraph [0057] *;
 [A]WO2011047429  (BELLMAX ACOUSTIC PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 9, line 8 - page 10, line 7; figure 2 * * page 13, line 16 - page 15, line 18 ** page 20, line 19 - page 21, line 17; figures 16,17 *
by applicantEP1673493
 WO2006108363
 EP2059630
 EP2173930
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.