Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: WO2014128239


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.02.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  23.03.2016  [2016/12]
12.02.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
03.11.2015 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
12.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
29.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
07.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication