Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: WO2014128239

WO2014128239 - METHOD, MANAGING ENTITY, AGENT ENTITY FOR CONSISTENT BANDWIDTH ALLOCATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.02.2016
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.02.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.03.2016  [2016/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Solutions and Networks GmbH & Co. KG
St.-Martin-Strasse 76
81541 Munich / DE
[N/P]
Inventor(s)01 / HAUTH, Stephan
Maienweg 71
89081 Ulm / DE
02 / WALLMEIER, Eugen
Bussardstrasse 14
82223 Eichenau / DE
03 / THEIMER, Thomas
Forstenrieder Weg 1g
82065 Baierbrunn / DE
04 / WEERAWARDANE, Thushara
Kotelawala Defence University
Ratmalana / LK
05 / ZAKI, Yasir
New York University Abu Dhabi (NYU AD)
Abu Dhabi P.O.Box 129188 / AE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date14706811.821.02.2014
WO2014EP53388
Priority number, dateEP2013000094025.02.2013         Original published format: EP 13000940
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014128239
Date:28.08.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2014
[2014/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W28/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleEnglish:METHOD, MANAGING ENTITY, AGENT ENTITY FOR CONSISTENT BANDWIDTH ALLOCATION
French:PROCÉDÉ, ENTITÉ DE GESTION ET ENTITÉ D'AGENT DESTINÉS À UNE ATTRIBUTION DE BANDE PASSANTE HOMOGÈNE
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application withdrawn by applicant  [2016/12]
26.09.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/12]
03.11.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2016/12]
Cited inInternational search[XAI]US2012218892  (KOTECHA LALIT R [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,10,11,15-18 * abstract * * figures 4,8-10 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0015] , [0016] , [0020] , [0021] , [0024] , [0028] , [0041] , [0045] , [0049] , [0053] - [0061] - [0075] , [0090] * [A] 6,13,14 [I] 9,12;
 [A]US6069872  (BONOMI FLAVIO [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2007127419  (SAPEK ADAM [US]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2009008817  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2008055936  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *
 [A]  - EKSTROM H, "QoS control in the 3GPP evolved packet system", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20090201), vol. 47, no. 2, doi:10.1109/MCOM.2009.4785383, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 76 - 83, XP011280742 [A] 1-18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2009.4785383
by applicant   - F. FIRMIN, THE EVOLVED PACKET CORE, (20130131), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/The-Evolved-Packet-Core,
    - 3GPP TS 23.401 V11.4.0 (2012-12, (20121218),
    - QoS Control in the 3GPP Evolved Packet System, IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE,
    - J. ERMAN; A. GERBER; K.K. RAMAKRISHNAN; S. SEN; O. SPATSCHECK, "Over The Top Video: the Gorilla in Cellular Networks", IMC'11, (20111102),