Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2988938

EP2988938 - METHOD FOR INK SETTING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Windmöller & Hölscher KG
Münsterstrasse 50
49525 Lengerich/Westf. / DE
[2016/09]
Inventor(s)01 / FLASPÖHLER, Martin
Hochholz 47
49124 Georgsmarienhütte / DE
02 / PÖTTER, Dietmar
Kortheider Weg 73
49492 Westerkappeln / DE
 [2016/09]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2019/48]
Former [2016/09]Vogel, Andreas , et al
Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142
44799 Bochum / DE
Application number, filing date14706833.226.02.2014
[2016/09]
WO2014EP53756
Priority number, dateDE20131010420825.04.2013         Original published format: DE102013104208
[2016/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014173562
Date:30.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2988938
Date:02.03.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2014
[2016/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2988938
Date:27.11.2019
Language:DE
[2019/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:B41F33/00
[2016/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR FARBEINSTELLUNG[2016/09]
English:METHOD FOR INK SETTING[2016/09]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'AJUSTEMENT DE COULEURS[2016/09]
Entry into regional phase25.11.2015National basic fee paid 
25.11.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
25.11.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.11.2015Examination requested  [2016/09]
05.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.2019Fee for grant paid
15.10.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.12.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[AD]EP2186640  (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER [DE]) [AD] 1-20 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0017] *;
 [A]DE4311132  (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1-20 * figure 1 * * claim 1 *