Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2986475

EP2986475 - DEVICE HAVING A CAMERA UNIT AND A DOUBLE-WALLED HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.12.2018
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.01.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.09.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.06.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 05.06.2019  [2019/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG
Steeger Strasse 17
42551 Velbert / DE
[2016/08]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHÜTZ, Heiko
Marsstrasse 55b
42549 Velbert / DE
02 / BUSCHMANN, Gerd
Homberger Weg 4a
42553 Velbert / DE
 [2016/08]
Representative(s)Vogel, Andreas , et al
Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142
44799 Bochum / DE
[2016/08]
Application number, filing date14706840.726.02.2014
[2016/08]
WO2014EP53767
Priority number, dateDE20131010393018.04.2013         Original published format: DE102013103930
[2016/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014170055
Date:23.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2986475
Date:24.02.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2014
[2016/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2986475
Date:21.02.2018
Language:DE
[2018/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:B60R99/00
[2016/08]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/08]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG MIT EINER KAMERAEINHEIT UND EINEM DOPPELWANDIGEN GEHÄUSE[2016/08]
English:DEVICE HAVING A CAMERA UNIT AND A DOUBLE-WALLED HOUSING[2016/08]
French:DISPOSITIF AVEC ENSEMBLE CAMÉRA ET BOÎTIER À DOUBLE PAROI[2016/08]
Entry into regional phase18.11.2015National basic fee paid 
18.11.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
18.11.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.11.2015Examination requested  [2016/08]
27.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
24.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.07.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
22.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.12.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
02.01.2018Fee for grant paid
02.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.11.2016
Opposition(s)22.11.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MC21.02.2018
MT21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SI21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
IE26.02.2018
LU26.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
FR21.04.2018
BG21.05.2018
GB21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
[2019/23]
Former [2019/21]AL21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MC21.02.2018
MT21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SI21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
IE26.02.2018
LU26.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
GB21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2019/12]AL21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MC21.02.2018
MT21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SI21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
IE26.02.2018
LU26.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2019/09]AL21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MC21.02.2018
MT21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
IE26.02.2018
LU26.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MC21.02.2018
MT21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
LU26.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MT21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MT21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MT21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MT21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/43]CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MT21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/40]CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/39]CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/36]CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
NO21.05.2018
Former [2018/35]CY21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
NO21.05.2018
Cited inInternational search[YA]US2004114039  (ISHIKURA MASAYUKI [JP]) [Y] 1-7,9-15 * paragraphs [0039] - [0043] - [0053]; figures 1-3 * [A] 8;
 [Y]WO2004012962  (MEKRA LANG GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-7,9-15 * abstract *