Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2953584

EP2953584 - BEARING FIXATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  08.11.2019
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 11.12.2019  [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
56 East Bell Drive
Warsaw, IN 46582 / US
[2015/51]
Inventor(s)01 / SMITH, Aaron P.
5260 N. Grouse Ct.
Warsaw Indiana 46582 / US
 [2015/51]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/51]Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date14707020.506.02.2014
[2015/51]
WO2014US15057
Priority number, dateUS20131376314508.02.2013         Original published format: US201313763145
[2015/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014124114
Date:14.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2953584
Date:16.12.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2014
[2015/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/34
[2015/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/51]
TitleGerman:LAGERFIXIERUNG[2015/51]
English:BEARING FIXATION[2015/51]
French:FIXATION DE PALIER[2015/51]
Entry into regional phase08.09.2015National basic fee paid 
08.09.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
08.09.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.09.2015Examination requested  [2015/51]
19.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/50]
04.11.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.11.2019
13.11.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)EP19205707.3
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.01.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
08.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]US5658338  (TULLOS HUGH S [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * figures 1A, 1B * * column 8, line 49 - line 62 * * column 10, line 41 - line 53 *;
 [A]EP0500477  (EUROS SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-7 * figure 5 * * column 4, line 26 - line 30 *;
 [A]DE4211346  (S & G IMPLANTS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * figure 3 * * column 2, line 45 - line 48 *;
 [A]US5549691  (HARWIN STEVEN F [US]) [A] 1-7 * figure 3 *