Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2953586

EP2953586 - APPARATUS FOR POSITIONING A PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/51]APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR POSITIONING A PROSTHESIS
[2019/44]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.10.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
56 East Bell Drive
Warsaw, IN 46582 / US
[2015/51]
Inventor(s)01 / WITT, Tyler D.
4379 Basswood Dr.
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
02 / DAVENPORT, Austen
181 North Lexington Drive
Columbia City, Indiana 46725 / US
[N/P]
Former [2015/51]01 / WITT, Tyler D.
4379 Basswood Dr.
Warsaw Indiana 46582 / US
02 / DAVENPORT, Austen
181 North Lexington Drive
Columbia City Indiana 46725 / US
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/51]Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date14707021.306.02.2014
[2015/51]
WO2014US15064
Priority number, dateUS20131376264608.02.2013         Original published format: US201313762646
[2015/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014124115
Date:14.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2953586
Date:16.12.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2014
[2015/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/46, A61F2/30
[2015/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/51]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR POSITIONIERUNG EINER PROTHESE[2019/44]
English:APPARATUS FOR POSITIONING A PROSTHESIS[2019/44]
French:APPAREIL POUR POSITIONNER UNE PROTHÈSE[2019/44]
Former [2015/51]VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR POSITIONIERUNG EINER PROTHESE
Former [2015/51]APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR POSITIONING A PROSTHESIS
Former [2015/51]APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR POSITIONNER UNE PROTHÈSE
Entry into regional phase08.09.2015National basic fee paid 
08.09.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
08.09.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.09.2015Examination requested  [2015/51]
19.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.01.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
08.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]US2005137603  (BELEW KEVIN [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0036]; figure 6 *;
 [A]US5904688  (GILBERT STEPHEN G [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 4, line 3 - line 5; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2003187512  (FREDERICK PHIL [US], et al) [A] 10-18 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] *;
 [E]FR2994645  (RECH S ET DE FABRICATION SERF SOC ET [FR], et al) [E] 10-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2007005144  (LEISINGER STEVEN R [US], et al) [A] 10-18 * the whole document *;
 [AP]EP2572679  (GREATBATCH MEDICAL SA [CH]) [AP] 10-18 * the whole document *