Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2958717

EP2958717 - HANDLE FOR A SHAVER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.03.2018
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2019New entry: Decision on request for further processing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Gillette Company LLC
One Gillette Park
Boston, MA 02127 / US
[2016/49]
Former [2016/01]For all designated states
The Gillette Company
World Shaving Headquarters
One Gillette Park
Boston, Massachusetts 02127 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHRISTIE, Vanessa
One Gillette Park
Boston, Massachusetts 02127 / US
02 / SZCZEPANOWSKI, Andrew, Anthony
One Gillette Park
Boston, Massachusetts 02127 / US
03 / EAGLETON, Christopher, Raymond
460 Basingstoke Road
Reading Berkshire RG2 0QE / GB
 [2016/01]
Representative(s)P&G Patent Germany
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Sulzbacher Straße 40
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/01]Kohol, Sonia
Technical Centres Limited
Procter & Gamble Patent Department
Rusham Park
Whitehall Lane
Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB
Application number, filing date14707622.820.02.2014
[2016/01]
WO2014US17234
Priority number, dateUS201361766928P20.02.2013         Original published format: US 201361766928 P
US20131409050626.11.2013         Original published format: US201314090506
[2016/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014130595
Date:28.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2958717
Date:30.12.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2014
[2015/53]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:B26B21/52
[2016/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/01]
TitleGerman:HANDGRIFF FÜR EIN RASIERER[2016/01]
English:HANDLE FOR A SHAVER[2016/01]
French:MANCHE POUR UN RASOIR[2016/01]
Entry into regional phase01.09.2015National basic fee paid 
01.09.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
01.09.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.09.2015Examination requested  [2015/53]
17.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.08.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
29.10.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.04.2018
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
29.10.2019Request for further processing filed
29.10.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.11.2019Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
07.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201805   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9300203  (GILLETTE CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5784790  (CARSON III WILLIAM C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantUSD644789S
 US2011219620
 US7975389
 US7874076
 US5497551
 US2011016734
 US6018877
 US6112421
 US2011088268
 WO9725189
 US2012042478
 US1234834
 US7168173
 US7197825
 US6449849
 US6442839
 US6301785
 US6298558
 US6161288
 US2008060201
 US7607230
 US7024776
 US2008034590
 US2009049695
 US7581318
 US7069658
 US6944952
 US6594904
 US6302785
 US6182365
 USD424745S
 US6185822
 US5113585
 US2009223057
 US2012167401
 US3972528
 US4932800
 US7160508
 US5314940
 US5670263
 US6610382
 US6904615
 US2002114920
 US2011143112
 US6868610
 WO2012157624