Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2968409

EP2968409 - TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY RESPIRATORY DISEASE USING BIOLOGICAL SOLUTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip09.03.2018New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings 
09.03.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 11.04.2018  [2018/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet Biologics, LLC
56 East Bell Drive
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
[2016/03]
Inventor(s)01 / LANDRIGAN, Matthew D.
2412 W. Harbourside Drive
Fort Wayne, Indiana 46814 / US
02 / O'SHAUGHNESSEY, Krista
137 Ems B27 Lane
Pierceton, Indiana 46562 / US
03 / WOODELL-MAY, Jennifer E.
218 E. Dellview Drive
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Handley, Matthew Edward
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/03]Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date14707909.918.02.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US16895
Priority number, dateUS20131384108315.03.2013         Original published format: US201313841083
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014149300
Date:25.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2968409
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014
[2016/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61K35/14, A61K38/17, A61P11/00
[2016/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
TitleGerman:BEHANDLUNG VON ENTZÜNDLICHEN ATEMWEGSERKRANKUNGEN MIT BIOLOGISCHEN LÖSUNGEN[2016/03]
English:TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY RESPIRATORY DISEASE USING BIOLOGICAL SOLUTIONS[2016/03]
French:TRAITEMENT DE MALADIE RESPIRATOIRE INFLAMMATOIRE AU MOYEN DE SOLUTIONS BIOLOGIQUES[2016/03]
Entry into regional phase13.10.2015National basic fee paid 
13.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
13.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
13.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/15]
07.03.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.03.2018
09.03.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.07.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2008021237  (ARUBOR CORP [US]; LEVITT ROY C [US]) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document * * claims 1, 2, 9, 19, 21 * * page 19, line 4 *;
 [Y]WO2006043972  (AMPROTEIN CORP [US]; HUI MIZHOU [US]) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document * * claims 1, 7, 8, 13, 14, 15 * * page 10, paragraph l - page 11, paragraph 1 *;
 [Y]US2009220482  (HIGGINS JOEL C [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document * * claims 15, 23, 25 * * page 5, column r, paragraph [52] *;
 [Y]US2010055087  (HIGGINS JOEL C [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [XY]US2002077276  (FREDEKING TERRY M [US] ET AL) [X] 1 * the whole document * * claims 1-3, 10, 14, 15, 16, 29, 39, 43, 25 * * page 40, paragraph [532] * * page 29, paragraph [369] * [Y] 1-9;
 [Y]  - O'SHAUGHNESSEY KRISTA M ET AL, "Blood-derived anti-inflammatory protein solution blocks the effect of IL-1 beta on human macrophages in vitro", IMFLAMMATION RESEARCH, BIRKHAEUSER VERLAG, BASEL, CH, (20111001), vol. 60, no. 10, doi:10.1007/S00011-011-0353-2, ISSN 1023-3830, pages 929 - 936, XP009172125 [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00011-011-0353-2
 [Y]  - JENNIFER WOODELL-MAY ET AL, "Autologous protein solution inhibits MMP-13 production by IL-1[beta] and TNF[alpha]-stimulated human articular chondrocytes", JOURNAL OF ORTHOPAEDIC RESEARCH, (20110901), vol. 29, no. 9, doi:10.1002/jor.21384, ISSN 0736-0266, pages 1320 - 1326, XP055013094 [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jor.21384
 [XY]  - ULICH T R ET AL, "INTRATRACHEAL ADMINISTRATION OF ENDOTOXIN AND CYTOKINES: IV. THE SOLUBLE TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR RECEPTOR TYPE 1 INHIBITS ACUTE INFLAMMATION", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY; [10640], ELSEVIER INC, US, (19930501), vol. 142, no. 5, ISSN 0002-9440, pages 1335 - 1338, XP009033316 [X] 1 * the whole document * * page 1336, column l, paragraph l - column r, paragraph 1 * * page 1337; tables 3, 4 * [Y] 1-9
 [Y]  - SORBERA L A, "PEGSUNERCEPT. PEGYLATED SOLUBLE TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR RECEPTOR TYPE 1 PEG-STNF-RI", DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, PROUS SCIENCE, ES, (20030101), vol. 28, no. 12, doi:10.1358/DOF.2003.028.12.772782, ISSN 0377-8282, pages 1182 - 1188, XP009033320 [Y] 1-9 * the whole document * * page 1186 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1358/dof.2003.028.12.772782
 [Y]  - NURSEN DÜZGÜN ET AL, "Cytokine inhibitors: soluble tumor necrosis factor receptor 1 and interleukin-1 receptor antagonist in Behçet's disease", RHEUMATOLOGY INTERNATIONAL ; CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL INVESTIGATIONS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20050101), vol. 25, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S00296-003-0400-6, ISSN 1437-160X, pages 1 - 5, XP019335129 [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00296-003-0400-6
 [Y]  - YOSHIDA S ET AL, "Elevation of serum soluble tumour necrosis factor (TNF) receptor and IL-1 receptor antagonist levels in bronchial asthma", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL IMMUNOLOGY, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD, GB, (19961001), vol. 106, no. 1, doi:10.1046/J.1365-2249.1996.D01-808.X, ISSN 0009-9104, pages 73 - 78, XP002287762 [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2249.1996.d01-808.x
by applicantUS7992725
 US5585007
 US6398972
 US6649072
 US6790371
 US7011852
 US7179391
 US7374678
 US7223346
 US7708152
 US7806276
 US8048297
 US2006278588
 US2009220482
 US2010055087
 US2011052561
 US2012030593
 US2012172836
 US7553413
 US7694828
 US7845499
 US6599873
 US5075222
 US2005197293
 US6623472
 US6713246
 US6759188
 US6337072
 US2001053764
    - LAPPALAINEN ET AL., "Interleukin-l f3 Causes Pulmonary Inflammation, Emphysema, and Airway Remodeling in the Adult Murine Lung", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF RESPIRATORY CELL AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (200504), vol. 32, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1165/rcmb.2004-0309OC, pages 311 - 318, XP002514957

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1165/rcmb.2004-0309OC
    - AREND WP; MALYAK M; GUTHIIDGE CJ; GABAY C, "Interleukin-1 receptor antagonist: role in biology", ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 16, doi:doi:10.1146/annurev.immunol.16.1.27, pages 27 - 55, XP000864694

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.immunol.16.1.27
    - WOODELL-MAY JE; RIDDERMAN DN; SWIFT MJ; HIGGINS J., "Producing Accurate Platelet Counts for Platelet Rich Plasma: Validation of a Hematology Analyzer and Preparation Techniques for Counting", J. CRANIOFAC. SURG., (200509), vol. 16, no. 5, pages 749 - 56