Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2994283

EP2994283 - DRY MORTAR PANEL AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/11]DRY MORTAR PANEL AND METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF
[2016/17]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.07.2017
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Franken Maxit Mauermörtel GmbH & Co.
Azendorf 63
95359 Kasendorf / DE
For all designated states
Johann Bergmann GmbH & Co.
Azendorf 63
95359 Azendorf / DE
[2016/11]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHARFE, Friedbert
Welschenkahl 37
95359 Kasendorf / DE
02 / GROPPWEIS, Sebastian
Am Petershof 1
95349 Thurnau / DE
 [2016/11]
Representative(s)Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
[2016/38]
Former [2016/11]Solf, Annkathrin
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Dr. Solf & Zapf
Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date14708527.828.02.2014
[2016/11]
WO2014EP53999
Priority number, dateDE2013100780007.05.2013         Original published format: DE102013007800
[2016/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014180582
Date:13.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2994283
Date:16.03.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2014
[2016/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2994283
Date:21.09.2016
Language:DE
[2016/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:B28B23/00, C04B26/02, C04B26/28, C04B40/06, E04G21/20, C04B28/02, C04B40/00, C04B41/45
[2016/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/11]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:TROCKENMÖRTELPLATTE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG[2016/17]
English:DRY MORTAR PANEL AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF[2016/17]
French:PLAQUE DE MORTIER SEC ET PROCÉDÉ DE LA FABRICATION DE LADITE PLAQUE[2016/17]
Former [2016/11]TROCKENMÖRTELPLATTE SOWIE VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG
Former [2016/11]DRY MORTAR PANEL AND METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF
Former [2016/11]PLAQUE DE MORTIER SEC ET PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT LA FABRICATION DE LADITE PLAQUE
Entry into regional phase13.10.2015National basic fee paid 
13.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
13.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.09.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/11]
19.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.08.2016Fee for grant paid
04.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.04.2016
Opposition(s)22.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.02.2014
AL21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
ES21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
MT21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
IE28.02.2017
LU28.02.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2019/19]AL21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
ES21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
MT21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
IE28.02.2017
LU28.02.2017
Former [2018/47]AL21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
ES21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
MT21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
LU28.02.2017
Former [2018/43]EE21.09.2016
ES21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
MT21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
LU28.02.2017
Former [2018/04]EE21.09.2016
ES21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
LU28.02.2017
Former [2017/52]EE21.09.2016
ES21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/48]EE21.09.2016
ES21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/32]EE21.09.2016
ES21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
NO21.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
NO21.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT21.09.2016
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO9118842  (HOEDT HELMUT [CH]) [X] 20 * page 1, lines 21-25; figures 1-3; claims 1-14 * * page 3, line 3 - page 5, line 33 * * page 6, line 3 - page 11, line 3 * [I] 21;
 [X]US5843544  (ANDERSEN PER JUST [US], et al) [X] 20 * column 15, line 37 - column 18, line 33 * * column 19, line 15 - column 20, line 58; figures 1-3 *;
 [I]US2012047833  (ALSEWAILEM FARES D [SA]) [I] 20,21 * paragraphs [0010] , [0015] - [0039]; figure 1; example 1 *;
 [IA]DE1954160  (WIENERBERGER BAUSTOFFIND AG) [I] 1-9,11,14,16-19 * page 1, lines 1-7 * * page 3, line 3 - page 7, line 12; claims 1-12 * [A] 10,12,13,15;
 [IA]DE2511097  (EVODE HOLDINGS LTD) [I] 1-9,11,14,16-19 * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 29; examples 1-6 * [A] 10,12,13,15;
 [A]EP0005814  (OLTMANNS ZIEGELWERK [DE]) [A] 1-19 * page 1, line 1 - page 12, line 5; claims 1-15; tables 1,2 *
 [A]  - Alexander Hartmann, "Mörtelband - Revolution am Bau", rent a scientist, (20100318), URL: http://www.rent-a-scientist.com/news/151-moertelband-revolution-am-bau.html, (20140513), XP055117803 [A] 1 * the whole document *