Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2950938

EP2950938 - METHOD FOR COATING SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.11.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HR, LV, NL, RS
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Natvi SAS
5 rue Marchand
91100 Corbeil-Essonnes / FR
[2015/50]
Inventor(s)01 / MICHELOT, Robert
16 rue des violettes
F-92160 Antony / FR
 [2015/50]
Representative(s)Monni, Richard
Cabinet LLR
11 boulevard de Sébastopol
75001 Paris / FR
[2015/50]
Application number, filing date14708595.531.01.2014
[2015/50]
WO2014FR50175
Priority number, dateFR2013005090201.02.2013         Original published format: FR 1350902
[2015/50]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014118473
Date:07.08.2014
Language:FR
[2014/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2950938
Date:09.12.2015
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2014
[2015/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2950938
Date:27.03.2019
Language:FR
[2019/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:B05D3/10, B05D7/00, C08G18/64, C08J7/04
[2015/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BESCHICHTUNG VON OBERFLÄCHEN[2015/50]
English:METHOD FOR COATING SURFACES[2015/50]
French:PROCEDE DE RECOUVREMENT DE SURFACES[2015/50]
Entry into regional phase15.07.2015National basic fee paid 
15.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
15.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/50]
20.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2019Fee for grant paid
15.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.10.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
22.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
NL27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
[2019/39]
Former [2019/38]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
Cited inInternational search[A]US5037677  (HALPERN GREGORY [US] ET AL) [A] 1,7,8,12-14 * column 1, line 55 - line 57 * * column 3, line 43 - line 49 * * example - *;
 [A]GB2163436  (HALPERN GREGORY; CAMPBELL CHARLES; BEAVERS ELLINGTON M; CHEH HUK Y) [A] 1,7,8,12-14 * page 1, line 5 - line 6 * * page 1, line 65 * * page 2, line 29 - line 34 * * page 2, line 58 - line 60 * * examples 3,5,8,11 * * claim - *;
 [A]TW200925700  (ZHANG LIN BI-YUN [TW]; GUO YI-ZHONG [TW]; LIN JUN-WEI [TW]) [A] 1,7,8,12-14 * abstract *