blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2951051 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2951051



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 211
27.09.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
11.05.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
19.04.2017 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
09.02.2017 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 6
24.11.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
27.10.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.10.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.10.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
17.10.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
17.10.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
17.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.08.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
04.08.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
04.08.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
04.08.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
04.08.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 18
15.07.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
22.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
11.11.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
24.09.2015 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
17.09.2015 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 7
04.09.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.09.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.09.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.09.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.09.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.08.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
17.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
17.07.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 11
17.07.2015 Declaration for SMEs Search / examination 1
17.07.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
19.06.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
02.09.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 49
14.08.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
14.08.2014 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 20
27.05.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
27.05.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
27.05.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
07.03.2014 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
07.03.2014 Claims International Searching Authority 2
07.03.2014 Description International Searching Authority 11
07.03.2014 Drawings International Searching Authority 5