blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2951051


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
08.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
29.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
29.09.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
15.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
04.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.09.2017  [2017/36]
21.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.08.2017  [2017/34]
14.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.08.2017  [2017/33]
07.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.08.2017  [2017/32]
30.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.08.2017  [2017/31]
16.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.07.2017  [2017/29]
26.05.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.06.2017  [2017/26]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
21.10.2016 (Expected) grant published on  23.11.2016  [2016/47]
19.10.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
19.10.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
19.10.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
03.08.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.07.2016 Change - applicant
29.07.2016 Change - applicant published on  31.08.2016  [2016/35]
22.07.2016 Change - classification published on  24.08.2016  [2016/34]
22.07.2016 Change - classification published on  24.08.2016  [2016/34]
08.04.2016 Change - extension states published on  11.05.2016  [2016/19]
05.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.11.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  09.12.2015  [2015/50]
06.11.2015 Request for examination filed published on  09.12.2015  [2015/50]
16.09.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
25.08.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
20.07.2015 Amendment by applicant
17.07.2015 Change - representative
17.07.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
28.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
15.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
23.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
15.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication