blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2951051
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9522612Global Dossier 20.12.2016B2
US2015336473 26.11.2015A1
Priority number Date
ITMI20130146 01.02.2013
WO2014IB58692 31.01.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6334567BGlobal Dossier 30.05.2018B2
JP2016507209 07.03.2016A
Priority number Date
ITMI20130146 01.02.2013
WO2014IB58692 31.01.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2951051Global Dossier 23.11.2016B1
EP2951051 09.12.2015A1
Priority number Date
ITMI20130146 01.02.2013
WO2014IB58692 31.01.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014122562Global Dossier 14.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
ITMI20130146 01.02.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ITMI20130146 02.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
ITMI20130146 01.02.2013