Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2951051

EP2951051 - SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING THE MACHINE TORQUE OF A VEHICLE HAVING TWO DRIVE WHEELS ACTUATED BY DISTINCT MOTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E-Novia S.r.l.
Via San Martino 12
20122 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2016/35]For all designated states
E-Novia S.r.l.
Piazzale G. Cesare 9
20145 Milano / IT
Former [2015/50]For all designated states
E-Novia S.r.l.
Piazzale G. Cesare 9
20145 Milan / IT
Inventor(s)01 / SPELTA, Cristiano
Via Ornago, 15
20882 Bellusco (MB) / IT
02 / LISANTI, Paolo
Via S. Carlo, 3
24040 Lallio (BG) / IT
03 / BONIOLO, Ivo
Via Comasinella, 97
20183 Bovisio Masciago (MB) / IT
04 / SAVARESI, Sergio Matteo
Largo Paolo Sarpi, 8
26100 Cremona / IT
05 / CORNO, Matteo
Via Conte Rosso, 23
20134 Milano / IT
 [2015/50]
Representative(s)Fiorentino, Luca , et al
Gregorj S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
Via L. Muratori, 13 b
20135 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2015/50]Fiorentino, Luca , et al
Gregorj S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
Via Muratori, 13 b
20135 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date14708658.131.01.2014
[2015/50]
WO2014IB58692
Priority number, dateIT2013MI0014601.02.2013         Original published format: IT MI20130146
[2015/50]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014122562
Date:14.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2951051
Date:09.12.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2014
[2015/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2951051
Date:23.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:B60W50/08, B60W30/02, B60L15/20, B60L11/18
[2016/34]
Former International [2015/50]B60L15/20, B60W50/08, B60W30/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR STEUERUNG DES MOTORDREHMOMENTS EINES FAHRZEUGES MIT ZWEI ANTRIEBSRÄDERN MIT UNTERSCHIEDLICHEN MOTOREN[2015/50]
English:SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING THE MACHINE TORQUE OF A VEHICLE HAVING TWO DRIVE WHEELS ACTUATED BY DISTINCT MOTORS[2015/50]
French:SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE COUPLE MACHINE D'UN VÉHICULE DOTÉ DE DEUX ROUES MOTRICES ACTIONNÉES PAR DES MOTEURS DISTINCTS[2015/50]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2015National basic fee paid 
17.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/50]
04.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.10.2016Fee for grant paid
17.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.08.2016
Opposition(s)24.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.01.2014
AT23.11.2016
BE23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
DK23.11.2016
EE23.11.2016
ES23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
IT23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
MC23.11.2016
NL23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RO23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SE23.11.2016
SI23.11.2016
SK23.11.2016
SM23.11.2016
CH31.01.2017
IE31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
LU31.01.2017
MT31.01.2017
BG23.02.2017
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]AT23.11.2016
BE23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
DK23.11.2016
EE23.11.2016
ES23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
IT23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
MC23.11.2016
NL23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RO23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SE23.11.2016
SI23.11.2016
SK23.11.2016
SM23.11.2016
CH31.01.2017
IE31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
LU31.01.2017
MT31.01.2017
BG23.02.2017
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2018/13]AT23.11.2016
BE23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
DK23.11.2016
EE23.11.2016
ES23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
IT23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
MC23.11.2016
NL23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RO23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SE23.11.2016
SI23.11.2016
SK23.11.2016
SM23.11.2016
CH31.01.2017
IE31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
LU31.01.2017
BG23.02.2017
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2017/51]AT23.11.2016
BE23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
DK23.11.2016
EE23.11.2016
ES23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
IT23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
MC23.11.2016
NL23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RO23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SE23.11.2016
SI23.11.2016
SK23.11.2016
SM23.11.2016
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
LU31.01.2017
BG23.02.2017
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2017/42]AT23.11.2016
BE23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
DK23.11.2016
EE23.11.2016
ES23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
IT23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
MC23.11.2016
NL23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RO23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SE23.11.2016
SK23.11.2016
SM23.11.2016
BG23.02.2017
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2017/38]AT23.11.2016
BE23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
DK23.11.2016
EE23.11.2016
ES23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
IT23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
NL23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RO23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SE23.11.2016
SK23.11.2016
SM23.11.2016
BG23.02.2017
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2017/37]AT23.11.2016
BE23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
DK23.11.2016
EE23.11.2016
ES23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
IT23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
NL23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RO23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SE23.11.2016
SK23.11.2016
SM23.11.2016
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2017/36]AT23.11.2016
BE23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
DK23.11.2016
EE23.11.2016
ES23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
NL23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RO23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SE23.11.2016
SK23.11.2016
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2017/34]AT23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
DK23.11.2016
ES23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
NL23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SE23.11.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2017/33]AT23.11.2016
DK23.11.2016
ES23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
NL23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SE23.11.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2017/26]AT23.11.2016
ES23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
NL23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SE23.11.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV23.11.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]US2011307129  (YU HAI [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0028] *;
 [A]DE102011017464  (EBERT KLAUS [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0022] *