Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2936735

EP2936735 - MULTIPLE USER WIRELESS DOCKING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.02.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.11.2019New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision 
18.11.2019New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2015/44]
Inventor(s)01 / VAN DE LAAR, Franciscus Antonius Maria
c/o High Tech Campus 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / DEES, Walter
c/o High Tech Campus 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2015/44]
Representative(s)Filip, Andrei Teodor
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2017/30]
Former [2015/44]Filip, Andrei Teodor
Philips International B.V.
Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date14708863.707.03.2014
[2015/44]
WO2014EP54416
Priority number, dateEP2013015856211.03.2013         Original published format: EP 13158562
EP2014015077910.01.2014         Original published format: EP 14150779
[2015/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014139868
Date:18.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2936735
Date:28.10.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014
[2015/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2936735
Date:26.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/18, H04L29/06, H04W4/00, // H04W4/06, H04W4/08
[2016/32]
Former International [2015/44]H04L12/18, H04L29/06, H04W4/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DRAHTLOSES ANDOCKEN FÜR MEHRERE BENUTZER[2015/44]
English:MULTIPLE USER WIRELESS DOCKING[2015/44]
French:STATION D'ACCUEIL SANS FIL À UTILISATEURS MULTIPLES[2016/32]
Former [2015/44]ACCUEIL SANS FIL DE MULTIPLES UTILISATEURS
Entry into regional phase21.07.2015National basic fee paid 
21.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/44]
24.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.02.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
22.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.06.2017Fee for grant paid
14.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.07.2016
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.04.2018   
Molnia, David
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Molnia, David
Df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
 [2018/22]
14.05.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.09.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.10.2019Date of oral proceedings
19.11.2019Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.11.2019Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
IE07.03.2018
LU07.03.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/09]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
IE07.03.2018
LU07.03.2018
Former [2019/04]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
LU07.03.2018
Former [2018/52]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/40]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/25]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/23]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/21]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/12]AT26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/11]AT26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/10]AT26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
NO26.10.2017
Former [2018/09]FI26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
NO26.10.2017
Former [2018/08]FI26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
NO26.10.2017
Former [2018/07]LT26.07.2017
NO26.10.2017
Cited inInternational search[A]US2012254773  (VISWANATHAN SUBRAMANIAN [IN]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0088] *;
 [A]US2012306622  (TRINH TRUNG TIM [CA], et al) [A] 1-14 * figure 1 * * figures 1, 5 * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0054] *;
 [A]EP2426903  (MITEL NETWORKS CORP [CA]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0053] *
OppositionUS2012254773
 US2012306622
 EP2426903
 US2005036509
    - "EasyMP Multi PC Projection Operation Guide", EPSON, (20100000), pages 1 - 47, XP055485121