Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2936735


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.01.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.02.2020 [2020/08]
18.11.2019 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
18.11.2019 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
26.01.2019 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
12.01.2019 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
30.12.2018 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
21.12.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.01.2019  [2019/04]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
21.09.2018 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
31.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.10.2018  [2018/40]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
13.05.2018 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
04.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
27.04.2018 Opposition filed published on  30.05.2018  [2018/22]
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
09.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
16.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.03.2018  [2018/12]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
19.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.02.2018  [2018/08]
12.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.02.2018  [2018/07]
23.06.2017 (Expected) grant published on  26.07.2017  [2017/30]
20.06.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
20.06.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
15.06.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
04.04.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.02.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
14.02.2017 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
10.02.2017 Change - classification published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
10.02.2017 Change - classification published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
06.12.2016 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
25.07.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.07.2016 Change - classification published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
15.07.2016 Change - classification published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
08.07.2016 Change - classification published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
08.07.2016 Change - classification published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
08.07.2016 Change - French title published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
13.05.2016 Change - extension states published on  15.06.2016  [2016/24]
06.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.02.2016 Amendment by applicant
25.09.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.10.2015  [2015/44]
25.09.2015 Request for examination filed published on  28.10.2015  [2015/44]
14.08.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
24.07.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
17.07.2015 Change - representative
17.07.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
02.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
20.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
18.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication