Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2968410

EP2968410 - TREATMENT OF PAIN USING PROTEIN SOLUTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 25.04.2018  [2018/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet Biologics, LLC
56 East Bell Drive
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
[2016/03]
Inventor(s)01 / O'SHAUGHNESSEY, Krista
137 Ems B27 Ln.
Pierceton, Indiana 46562 / US
02 / WOODELL-MAY, Jennifer E.
218 E. Dellview Dr.
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
03 / HIGGINS, Joel C.
8025 S. Beaver Dam Rd.
Claypool, Indiana 46510 / US
04 / LEACH, Michael D.
2730 East Setter Ln.
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Handley, Matthew Edward
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/03]Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date14709014.614.02.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US16421
Priority number, dateUS20131383748015.03.2013         Original published format: US201313837480
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014149270
Date:25.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2968410
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014
[2016/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61K35/14, A61K38/17, A61P19/00, A61P9/00
[2016/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
TitleGerman:SCHMERZBEHANDLUNG MIT PROTEINLÖSUNGEN[2016/03]
English:TREATMENT OF PAIN USING PROTEIN SOLUTIONS[2016/03]
French:TRAITEMENT DE LA DOULEUR À L'AIDE DE SOLUTIONS DE PROTÉINES[2016/03]
Entry into regional phase14.10.2015National basic fee paid 
14.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
14.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
27.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.03.2018
08.03.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
15.03.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/17]
Divisional application(s)EP18160602.1
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.10.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2004258671  (WATKINS LINDA MAY ROTHBLUM [US]) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document * * claims 1-38 * * paragraph [[0088]] *;
 [Y]US2008019964  (OLMARKER KJELL [SE], et al) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document * * claims 3-17, 126, 127, * * page 7, paragraph [0072] * * page 5, paragraphs [0052], [0054] *;
 [Y]US2009263319  (WOHABREBBI AMIRA [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * page 4, paragraphs [0039], [0040] *;
 [Y]US2010055087  (HIGGINS JOEL C [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * page 3, paragraph [0028]; claims 1-23 *;
 [Y]US2009220482  (HIGGINS JOEL C [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document * * claims 15, 23, 25 * * page 5, column r, paragraph [52] *;
 [Y]WO2012030593  (BIOMET BIOLOGICS LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [Y]  - O'SHAUGHNESSEY KRISTA M ET AL, "Blood-derived anti-inflammatory protein solution blocks the effect of IL-1 beta on human macrophages in vitro", IMFLAMMATION RESEARCH, BIRKHAEUSER VERLAG, BASEL, CH, (20111001), vol. 60, no. 10, doi:10.1007/S00011-011-0353-2, ISSN 1023-3830, pages 929 - 936, XP009172125 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00011-011-0353-2
 [Y]  - JENNIFER WOODELL-MAY ET AL, "Autologous protein solution inhibits MMP-13 production by IL-1[beta] and TNF[alpha]-stimulated human articular chondrocytes", JOURNAL OF ORTHOPAEDIC RESEARCH, (20110901), vol. 29, no. 9, doi:10.1002/jor.21384, ISSN 0736-0266, pages 1320 - 1326, XP055013094 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jor.21384
 [Y]  - SORBERA L A, "PEGSUNERCEPT. PEGYLATED SOLUBLE TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR RECEPTOR TYPE 1 PEG-STNF-RI", DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, PROUS SCIENCE, ES, (20030101), vol. 28, no. 12, doi:10.1358/DOF.2003.028.12.772782, ISSN 0377-8282, pages 1182 - 1188, XP009033320 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document * * page 1186 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1358/dof.2003.028.12.772782
 [Y]  - ZHANG ET AL, "IL-1ra alleviates inflammatory hyperalgesia through preventing phosphorylation of NMDA receptor NR-1 subunit in rats", PAIN, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20080305), vol. 135, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.PAIN.2007.05.023, ISSN 0304-3959, pages 232 - 239, XP022512632 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pain.2007.05.023
 [XP]  - William King Ph.D. Jennifer Woodell-May Ph.D.., "A Simple Method to Correlate the Concentration of an Anti-Inflammatory Cytokine with White Blood Cells in an Autologous Protein Solution", (20140224), URL: http://prgmobileapps.com/AppUpdates/ors/Abstracts/abs391.html, (20140425), XP002723703 [XP] 1-6 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - MEIJER H ET AL, "The production of anti-inflammatory cytokines in whole blood by physico-chemical induction", IMFLAMMATION RESEARCH, BIRKHAEUSER VERLAG, BASEL, CH, (20031001), vol. 52, no. 10, doi:10.1007/S00011-003-1197-1, ISSN 1023-3830, pages 404 - 407, XP002434400 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00011-003-1197-1
 [Y]  - Anonymous, "Update for veterinarians", (201212), Vet.osu.edu/vmc, URL: http://vet.osu.edu/sites/default/files/documents/pdf/news/vmc/ovmaVeterinarianUpdate/20121112.pdf, (20140428), XP002723730 [Y] 1-6 * page 3, column l *
by applicantUS7992725
 US5585007
 US6398972
 US6649072
 US6790371
 US7011852
 US7179391
 US7374678
 US7223346
 US7708152
 US7806276
 US8048297
 US2006278588
 US2009220482
 US2010055087
 US2011052561
 US2012030593
 US2012172836
 US7553413
 US7694828
 US7845499
 US6599873
 US5075222
 US2005197293
 US6623472
 US6713246
 US6759188
 US6337072
 US2001053764
    - WOODELL-MAY JE; RIDDERMAN DN; SWIFT MJ; HIGGINS J, "Producing Accurate Platelet Counts for Platelet Rich Plasma: Validation of a Hematology Analyzer and Preparation Techniques for Counting", J. CRANIOFAC. SURG., (200509), vol. 16, no. 5, pages 749 - 56