Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2959541

EP2959541 - MULTIPLE ANTENNA SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.05.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2016/01]
Inventor(s)01 / JENWATANAVET, Jatupum
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2016/01]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/01]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date14709053.419.02.2014
[2016/01]
WO2014US17164
Priority number, dateUS20131377362621.02.2013         Original published format: US201313773626
[2016/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014130555
Date:28.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2959541
Date:30.12.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2014
[2015/53]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01Q1/52, H01Q9/04, H01Q9/42
[2016/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/01]
TitleGerman:MEHRANTENNENSYSTEM[2016/01]
English:MULTIPLE ANTENNA SYSTEM[2016/01]
French:SYSTÈME MULTIANTENNE[2016/01]
Entry into regional phase29.07.2015National basic fee paid 
29.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
29.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/53]
05.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.05.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
07.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
07.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
08.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2009284433  (TSUTSUMI YUKAKO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,11-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0036] - [0046] * [I] 2-10,15-20;
 [A]US2009009401  (SUZUKI HIROMICHI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-20 * figure 3 * * paragraphs [0054] - [0058] *;
 [A]US2009073047  (LE BOLZER FRANCOISE [FR] ET AL) [A] 1-20 * figures 1a,11,16 * * paragraphs [0032] - [0033] * * paragraphs [0070] , [0071] * * paragraph [0083] *;
 [A]WO2013010145  (QUALCOMM INC [US]; SHI GUINING [US]; TRAN ALLEN MINH-TRIET [US]; WYRWI) [A] 1-20 * figures 3-5 * * paragraphs [0028] - [0054] *