Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2965573

EP2965573 - TRANSMIT POWER CALIBRATION FOR MATCHING THE COVERAGE OF DIFFERENT RADIO TECHNOLOGIES ON A COMMON RADIO NODE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.10.2017
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.11.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2016/02]
Inventor(s)01 / PRAKASH, Rajat
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / YAVUZ, Mehmet
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / MESHKATI, Farhad
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / PATEL, Chirag Sureshbhai
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
05 / KADOUS, Tamer Adel
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714v / US
 [2016/02]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2016/50]
Former [2016/02]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date14710081.214.02.2014
[2016/02]
WO2014US16543
Priority number, dateUS201361773768P06.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361773768 P
US20141417961313.02.2014         Original published format: US201414179613
[2016/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014137569
Date:12.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2965573
Date:13.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2014
[2016/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2965573
Date:14.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W52/24, H04W84/04
[2016/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/02]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ÜBERTRAGUNGSLEISTUNGSKALIBRIERUNG ZUR ANPASSUNG DER VERSORGUNG VON VERSCHIEDENEN FUNKTECHNOLOGIEN AUF EINEM GEMEINSAMEN FUNKKNOTEN[2016/02]
English:TRANSMIT POWER CALIBRATION FOR MATCHING THE COVERAGE OF DIFFERENT RADIO TECHNOLOGIES ON A COMMON RADIO NODE[2016/02]
French:ÉTALONNAGE DE LA PUISSANCE D'ÉMISSION POUR L'ADAPTATION À LA COUVERTURE DE DIFFÉRENTES TECHNOLOGIES RADIO SUR UN NOEUD RADIO COMMUN[2016/02]
Entry into regional phase30.07.2015National basic fee paid 
30.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
30.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.07.2015Examination requested  [2016/02]
01.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.11.2016Fee for grant paid
03.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.07.2016
Opposition(s)15.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.02.2014
AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CY14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
IE14.02.2017
LU14.02.2017
MT14.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU14.02.2014
AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
IE14.02.2017
LU14.02.2017
MT14.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2018/43]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
IE14.02.2017
LU14.02.2017
MT14.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2018/13]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
IE14.02.2017
LU14.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2018/04]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
LU14.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2017/51]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2017/42]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2017/41]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2017/37]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
Former [2017/36]BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
Former [2017/34]CZ14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
BE28.02.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
Former [2017/31]FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
BE28.02.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
BE28.02.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV14.12.2016
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2012052793  (BRISEBOIS ARTHUR RICHARD [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,6,8-10,13,15-17,20,22-24,27 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058] * [I] 4,5,7,11,12,14,18,19,21,25,26,28;
 [X]EP2464177  (HTC CORP [TW]) [X] 1-3,6,8-10,13,15-17,20,22-24,27 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0033] *;
 [X]WO2012122116  (QUALCOMM INC [US]; NGAI FRANCIS M [US]; FORRESTER JOHN A [US]; VAIDYAN) [X] 1,8,15,22 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0110] *