Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2959619

EP2959619 - INDICATING WHETHER DATA WAS SUBJECTED TO INTERFERENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2016/01]
Inventor(s)01 / MERLIN, Simone
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / TANDRA, Rahul
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / BARRIAC, Gwendolyn Denise
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / ZHOU, Yan
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
05 / SAMPATH, Hemanth
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
06 / JONES IV, Vincent Knowles
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2016/01]
Representative(s)Wimmer, Hubert , et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/01]Wimmer, Hubert , et al
WAGNER & GEYER Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date14710438.424.02.2014
[2016/01]
WO2014US18039
Priority number, dateUS201361768975P25.02.2013         Original published format: US 201361768975 P
US20141418465119.02.2014         Original published format: US201414184651
[2016/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014130951
Date:28.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2959619
Date:30.12.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2014
[2015/53]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/00, H04L1/16
[2016/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/01]
TitleGerman:ANZEIGE, OB DATEN UNTER INTERFERENZEN LITTEN[2016/01]
English:INDICATING WHETHER DATA WAS SUBJECTED TO INTERFERENCE[2016/01]
French:INDICATION DU FAIT QUE DES DONNÉES ONT SUBI UN BROUILLAGE OU NON[2016/01]
Entry into regional phase25.09.2015National basic fee paid 
25.09.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
25.09.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.08.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.09.2015Examination requested  [2015/53]
11.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.10.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.03.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
07.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
07.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201906   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2005129058  (CASACCIA LORENZO [IT] ET AL) [X] 1-6,10-20,22-29 * figures 3,4 * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0053] * * claims 9,10 * [I] 7-9;
 [XI]US2007183451  (LOHR JOACHIM [DE] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,10,11,13,16,17,19,20,25,26,28,29 * figure 13 * * paragraph [0116] - paragraph [0117] * * paragraph [0129] - paragraph [0137] * [I] 5-9,14,15,22,23;
 [XI]US2010162069  (NIU HUANING [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,10,11,13,16,17,19,20,25,26,28,29 * figures 3,5-7 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0034] * [I] 5-9,14,15,22,23;
 [XI]US2001014091  (YAMADA TAKAMITSU [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,10,11,13,16,17,19,20,24-26,28,29 * figures 4-7,11-15 * [I] 5-9,14,15,22,23;
 [A]US2010238818  (TAKAOKA SHINSUKE [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-30 * figures 2-4 * * paragraphs [0047] - [0049] - [0 52] - [0058] - [0 63] *