blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2968655 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2968655



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 190
09.01.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
29.11.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.11.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.11.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
13.11.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
13.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.07.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
04.07.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
04.07.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
04.07.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
04.07.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 18
09.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
09.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
09.02.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
09.02.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
09.02.2018 Description Search / examination 4
09.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.02.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
08.11.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
08.11.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.11.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
17.08.2017 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
07.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.06.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
07.06.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
07.06.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
07.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.12.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
27.11.2015 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
04.11.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
13.10.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.10.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
02.10.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
14.08.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
29.10.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
09.10.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
09.10.2014 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 23
13.05.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
13.05.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
13.05.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3