blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2968655


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
30.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.10.2019 [2019/40]
23.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.09.2019 [2019/39]
16.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
09.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
26.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.08.2019  [2019/35]
19.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2019  [2019/34]
12.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
21.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
17.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.06.2019  [2019/25]
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
03.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
26.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.05.2019  [2019/22]
19.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
12.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.05.2019  [2019/20]
23.11.2018 (Expected) grant published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
16.11.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
16.11.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
16.11.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
03.07.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.06.2018 Change - French title published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
17.02.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.02.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
17.11.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.11.2017 First examination report
14.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.06.2016 Amendment by applicant
20.05.2016 Change - extension states published on  22.06.2016  [2016/25]
13.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.12.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  20.01.2016  [2016/03]
18.12.2015 Request for examination filed published on  20.01.2016  [2016/03]
18.11.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
03.11.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
13.10.2015 Change - representative
13.10.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
24.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
10.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
22.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication