Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2968655

EP2968655 - POROUS METAL GLENOID AND ASSOCIATED METHOD FOR MOLDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.11.2018
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.07.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IS, SK
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
56 East Bell Drive
Warsaw, IN 46582 / US
[2016/03]
Inventor(s)01 / WINSLOW, Nathan, A.
2677 Lake Tahoe Trail
Warsaw, IN 46582 / US
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2016/03]
Application number, filing date14710484.828.02.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US19297
Priority number, dateUS20131379845913.03.2013         Original published format: US201313798459
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014163958
Date:09.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2968655
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014
[2016/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2968655
Date:26.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61L27/04, A61L27/34, A61L27/56, A61F2/40
[2016/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHULTERGELENKPFANNE AUS EINEM PORÖSEN METALL UND VERFAHREN ZUR FORMUNG DAVON[2016/03]
English:POROUS METAL GLENOID AND ASSOCIATED METHOD FOR MOLDING THE SAME[2016/03]
French:ÉLÉMENT GLÉNOÏDE EN MÉTAL POREUX ET PROCÉDÉ DE MOULAGE ASSOCIÉ[2018/29]
Former [2016/03]ÉLÉMENT GLÉNOÏDE EN ÉTAL POREUX ET PROCÉDÉ DE MOULAGE ASSOCIÉ
Entry into regional phase13.10.2015National basic fee paid 
13.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
13.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
07.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.11.2018Fee for grant paid
13.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.11.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL26.12.2018
CZ26.12.2018
EE26.12.2018
ES26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
IT26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
PL26.12.2018
RO26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
SK26.12.2018
SM26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
IS26.04.2019
PT26.04.2019
[2019/39]
Former [2019/37]AL26.12.2018
CZ26.12.2018
EE26.12.2018
ES26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
IT26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
PL26.12.2018
RO26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
SM26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/35]AL26.12.2018
CZ26.12.2018
ES26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
IT26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
PL26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/34]AL26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
IT26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/33]AL26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/30]AL26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/25]FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/24]FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/23]FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
NO26.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT26.12.2018
NO26.03.2019
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1800700  (HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP [US]) [X] 1-20 * page 4, paragraphs 45-49 * * page 4, paragraph 52 - page 5, paragraph 57 * * page 11, paragraphs 106-110 * * page 13, paragraphs 123, 131 * * claim - *;
 [X]EP1676548  (DEPUY PRODUCTS INC [US]) [X] 1-14,16 * column 3, paragraph 26 * * column 5, paragraph 35 * * claim - *;
 [X]WO2011138646  (LIMACORPORATE SPA [IT]; PRESSACCO MICHELE [IT]) [X] 1-14,17,18 * page 3, line 19 - page 5, line 12 * * page 7, line 23 - page 9, line 2 * * claim - *