Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2953951

EP2953951 - N2-SUBSTITUTED-N6-(6-ARYL-PYRIDINE-3-YLMETHYL)-9-CYCLOPENTYL-9H-PURINE-2,6-DIAMINE DERIVATIVES AS TUMOR SUPPRESSOR P53 ACTIVATORS FOR INHIBITING ANGIOGENESIS AND FOR TREATING CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/51]2-SUBSTITUTED-6-BIARYLMETHYLAMINO-9-CYCLOPENTYL-9H-PURINE DERIVATIVES, USE THEREOF AS MEDICAMENTS, AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS
[2017/04]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.01.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG, LV, PL, RS, SE
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Univerzita Palackeho v Olomouci
Krizkovskeho 7
77200 Olomouc / CZ
For all designated states
Biopatterns s.r.o.
Slechtitelu 813/21
77900 Olomouc, Holice / CZ
[2017/09]
Former [2015/51]For all designated states
Univerzita palackeho V Olomouci
Krizkovskeho 7
772 00 Olomouc / CZ
For all designated states
Biopatterns s.r.o.
Slechtitelu 813/21
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
Inventor(s)01 / GUCKY, Tomas
Mladejovice 117
78501 Mladejovice / CZ
02 / JORDA, Radek
Zelena 5
77900 Olomouc / CZ
03 / ZATLOUKAL, Marek
Revolucni 18a
78701 Sumperk / CZ
04 / KRYSTOF, Vladimir
Varsavske nam. 1099/7
77900 Olomouc / CZ
05 / RAROVA, Lucie
Prchalov 98
74258 Pribor / CZ
06 / REZNICKOVA, Eva
Foerstrova 13
77900 Olomouc / CZ
07 / MIKULITS, Wolfgang
Bergmiller-Gasse 6/41
A-1140 Wien / AT
08 / STRNAD, Miroslav
Zapadni 25
77900 Olomouc / CZ
 [2015/51]
Representative(s)Hartvichova, Katerina
Inventia s.r.o.
Na Belidle 3
150 00 Praha 5 / CZ
[2015/51]
Application number, filing date14710788.205.02.2014
[2015/51]
WO2014CZ00014
Priority number, dateCZ2013000008808.02.2013         Original published format: CZ 20130088
[2015/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2014121764
Date:14.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2953951
Date:16.12.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2014
[2015/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2953951
Date:03.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/18]
Search report(s)International search reportEP16.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:C07D473/16, A61K31/52, A61P35/00
[2015/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:N2-SUBSTITUIERTE-N6-(6-ARYL-PYRIDIN-3-YLMETHYL)-9-CYCLOPENTYL-9H-PURIN-2,6-DIAMIN-DERIVATE ALS TUMOR SUPPRESSOR P53 AKTIVATOREN ZUR ANGIOGENESE-HEMMUNG UND ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS[2017/04]
English:N2-SUBSTITUTED-N6-(6-ARYL-PYRIDINE-3-YLMETHYL)-9-CYCLOPENTYL-9H-PURINE-2,6-DIAMINE DERIVATIVES AS TUMOR SUPPRESSOR P53 ACTIVATORS FOR INHIBITING ANGIOGENESIS AND FOR TREATING CANCER[2017/04]
French:DÉRIVÉS 2,6-DIAMINES DE 9H-PURINE N2-SUBSTITUTÉS-N6-(6-ARYL-PYRIDINE-3-YLMÉTHYL)-9-CYCLOPENTYL EN TANT QUE ACTIVATEURS DU SUPRESSEUR DE TUMEUR P53 POUR INHIBER L'ANGIOGÉNÈSE ET POUR TRAITER DU CANCER[2017/04]
Former [2015/51]2-SUBSTITUIERTE-6-BIARYLMETHYLAMINO-9-CYCLOPENTYL-9H-PURINDERIVATE, VERWENDUNG DAVON ALS ARZNEIMITTEL UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN
Former [2015/51]2-SUBSTITUTED-6-BIARYLMETHYLAMINO-9-CYCLOPENTYL-9H-PURINE DERIVATIVES, USE THEREOF AS MEDICAMENTS, AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS
Former [2015/51]DÉRIVÉS DE 6-BIARYLMÉTHYLAMINO-9-CYCLOPENTYL-9H-PURINE 2-SUBSTITUÉE, LEUR UTILISATION COMME MÉDICAMENTS ET COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES LES CONTENANT
Entry into regional phase22.07.2015National basic fee paid 
22.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
22.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/51]
19.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.03.2017Fee for grant paid
27.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.10.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
[2017/50]
Former [2017/49]AT03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO03022805  (ALBANY MOLECULAR RES INC [US]) [Y] 1-9 * page 97; example 144; claim - *;
 [Y]WO03022219  (ALBANY MOLECULAR RES INC [US]) [Y] 1-9 * page 97; example 144; claim - *;
 [Y]WO03022216  (ALBANY MOLECULAR RES INC [US]) [Y] 1-9 * page 96; example 144; claim - *;
 [Y]WO0044750  (CV THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [Y] 1-9 * page 16; claim - *;
 [Y]WO0055161  (ALBANY MOLECULAR RES INC [US]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract *;
 [Y]  - SCHOW STEVEN R ET AL, "Synthesis and activity of 2,6,9-trisubstituted purines", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19970101), vol. 7, no. 21, doi:10.1016/S0960-894X(97)10076-2, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 2697 - 2702, XP002481170 [Y] 1-9 * table 1; compound 20 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(97)10076-2
by applicantWO03040144
 WO2004058791
 WO2009003428
 WO2009043320
 US696970
 WO03022216
 WO0055161
    - EL-SERAG; RUDOLPH, GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2007), vol. 132, no. 7, pages 2557 - 76,
    - FARAZI; DEPINHO, NAT REV CANCER, (2006), vol. 6, no. 9, pages 674 - 87,
    - CHUA; CHOO, INT J HEPATOL, (2011), page 348297,
    - TANAKA; ARII, J GASTROENTEROL, (2011), vol. 46, no. 3, pages 289 - 96,
    - WELKER; TROJAN, WORLD J GASTROENTEROL, (20101214), vol. 17, no. 26, pages 3075 - 81,
    - KIM ET AL., ONCOLOGY, (2011), vol. 25, no. 3, pages 283 - 91,295,
    - LLOVET; BRUIX, J HEPATOL, (2008), vol. 48, no. 1, pages 20 - 37,
    - LLOVET; BRUIX, HEPATOLOGY, (2003), vol. 37, no. 2, pages 429 - 42,
    - MARELLI ET AL., CANCER TREAT REV, (2006), vol. 32, no. 8, pages 594 - 606,
    - ZIJL ET AL., FUTURE ONCOL, (2009), vol. 5, no. 8, pages 1169 - 79,
    - ZIJL ET AL., MOL CANCER THER, (2011), vol. 10, no. 5, pages 850 - 60,
    - SHUM ET AL., NUCLEOS. NUCLEOT., (2001), vol. 20, pages 1067 - 1078,
    - DREYER ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2001), vol. 44, pages 524 - 530,
    - ZILJ ET AL., FUTURE ONCOL, (2009), vol. 5, no. 8, pages 1169 - 79,
    - PUISIEUX ET AL., FASEB J., (199311), vol. 7, no. 14, pages 1407 - 13,
    - CHEN ET AL., BLOOD, (20051001), vol. 106, no. 7, pages 2513 - 9,
    - MACCALLUM ET AL., CANCER RES., (20050615), vol. 65, no. 12, pages 5399 - 407,
    - MANOHAR ET AL., LEUK RES., (201106), vol. 35, no. 6, pages 821 - 30,
    - LIEBL ET AL., J BIOL CHEM., (20101112), vol. 285, no. 46, pages 35932 - 43,
    - CARRASCO ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (2003), vol. 34, no. 5, pages 1064 - 67,
    - FREBUNG ET AL., CANCER RES., vol. 52, pages 1992 - 6976,
    - KRYSTOFET, EUR J MED CHEM., (201109), vol. 46, no. 9, pages 4289 - 94,
    - KRYSTOFET, EUR J MED CHEM., (2011), vol. 46, no. 9, pages 4289 - 94,
    - LEY, TRENDS MOL MED., (200306), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 263 - 8,
    - GRIDLING ET AL., INT J ONCOL., (200904), vol. 34, no. 4, pages 1117 - 28,
    - FERLAY ET AL., INT J CANCER., (2010), vol. 127, no. 12, pages 2893 - 917,
 WO2010CZ00067
 WO2010CZ00004