blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2979109

EP2979109 - MEASUREMENT OF REFLECTED ULTRASOUND SIGNAL FOR ULTRASONIC EMITTER GATING CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.04.2021
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.04.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.03.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Symbol Technologies, LLC
One Zebra Plaza
Holtsville, NY 11742 / US
[2020/22]
Former [2016/05]For all designated states
Symbol Technologies, LLC
One Zebra Plaza
Holtsville NY 11742 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CALVARESE, Russell E.
22 Shade Tree Lane
Stony Brook, New York 11790 / US
 [2016/05]
Representative(s)LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf Patentanwalt Attorney at Law PartG mbB
Brienner Straße 11
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2020/22]LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf PartG mbB Patentanwälte
Brienner Straße 11
80333 München / DE
Former [2016/05]Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date14711655.227.02.2014
[2016/05]
WO2014US19002
Priority number, dateUS20131385162027.03.2013         Original published format: US201313851620
[2016/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2014158643
Date:02.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2979109
Date:03.02.2016
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2016/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2979109
Date:27.05.2020
Language:EN
[2020/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.10.2014
ClassificationIPC:G01S15/04, G01S15/10, G01S15/52, G01S15/58, G01S7/52, G01S7/524
[2016/05]
CPC:
G01S7/52004 (EP,US); G01S15/02 (US); G01S15/10 (EP,US);
G01S15/523 (EP,US); G01S7/524 (EP,US); G01S15/04 (EP,US);
G01S15/14 (US); G01S15/582 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:MESSUNG EINES REFLEKTIERTEN ULTRASCHALLSIGNALS ZUR TAKTSTEUERUNG EINES ULTRASCHALLEMITTERS[2016/05]
English:MEASUREMENT OF REFLECTED ULTRASOUND SIGNAL FOR ULTRASONIC EMITTER GATING CONTROL[2016/05]
French:MESURE DE SIGNAL ULTRASONORE RÉFLÉCHI POUR COMMANDE DE PORTILLONNAGE D'ÉMETTEUR ULTRASONORE[2016/05]
Entry into regional phase26.10.2015National basic fee paid 
26.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
26.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/05]
11.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.04.2020Fee for grant paid
16.04.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.04.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.12.2017
Opposition(s)02.03.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
20.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
20.02.2020Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.02.2014
AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CY27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
IT27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
MC27.05.2020
MK27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
GB27.02.2021
IE27.02.2021
LU27.02.2021
BE28.02.2021
CH28.02.2021
FR28.02.2021
LI28.02.2021
[2024/22]
Former [2023/30]HU27.02.2014
AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CY27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
IT27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
MC27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
GB27.02.2021
IE27.02.2021
LU27.02.2021
BE28.02.2021
CH28.02.2021
FR28.02.2021
LI28.02.2021
Former [2023/27]HU27.02.2014
AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
IT27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
MC27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
GB27.02.2021
IE27.02.2021
LU27.02.2021
BE28.02.2021
CH28.02.2021
FR28.02.2021
LI28.02.2021
Former [2022/33]AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
IT27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
MC27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
GB27.02.2021
IE27.02.2021
LU27.02.2021
BE28.02.2021
CH28.02.2021
FR28.02.2021
LI28.02.2021
Former [2022/08]AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
IT27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
MC27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
GB27.02.2021
IE27.02.2021
LU27.02.2021
CH28.02.2021
FR28.02.2021
LI28.02.2021
Former [2022/07]AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
IT27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
MC27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
IE27.02.2021
LU27.02.2021
CH28.02.2021
FR28.02.2021
LI28.02.2021
Former [2021/47]AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
IT27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
MC27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
LU27.02.2021
CH28.02.2021
LI28.02.2021
Former [2021/41]AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
IT27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
MC27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2021/24]AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
IT27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2021/10]AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
IT27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2021/09]AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
IT27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2021/08]AL27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2021/04]AL27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2021/01]FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2020/51]FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2020/50]FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2020/48]FI27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
NO27.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2020/47]LT27.05.2020
NO27.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
Former [2020/46]IS27.09.2020
Cited inInternational search[A]US5198989  (PETROFF ALAN M [US]) [A] 7,13* column 16, line 12 - line 37 *;
 [IA]WO0192070  (FORD GLOBAL TECHONOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [I] 1,2,7,9,11 * abstract * * page 4, line 23 - line 26 * * page 5, line 3 - line 10 * * page 7, line 3 - page 8, line 33 * * page 10, line 3 - line 8 * [A] 3-6,8,10,12,13;
 [XA]WO2006099601  (AMETEK INC [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * [A] 2-10,12,13
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.