blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2966992 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2966992



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 673
01.07.2019 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
01.07.2019 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.05.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
13.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
13.05.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 91
13.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
13.05.2019 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.05.2019 Consolidated list of cited opposition documents Opposition 1
06.05.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 001 Opposition 14
06.05.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 002 Opposition 22
06.05.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 003 Opposition 22
06.05.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 004 Opposition 14
06.05.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 005 Opposition 17
06.05.2019 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.05.2019 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
15.04.2019 Request for documents Opposition 1
28.03.2019 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
28.03.2019 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
12.03.2019 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 17
12.03.2019 Request for documents Opposition 1
04.03.2019 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.03.2019 Notice of opposition Opposition 15
18.06.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
11.05.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
04.05.2018 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
22.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.02.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
22.02.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
22.02.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
22.12.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
22.12.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
22.12.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.12.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
22.12.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 25
14.11.2017 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
31.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
31.10.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 26
31.10.2017 Amended drawings with annotations Search / examination 2
31.10.2017 Description Search / examination 21
31.10.2017 Drawings Search / examination 2
31.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
31.10.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
27.10.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
27.10.2017 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
27.10.2017 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
13.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.10.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
13.10.2017 Claims Search / examination 2
13.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.10.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 3
12.06.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
02.06.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
22.05.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
22.05.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
22.05.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
22.05.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
10.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.02.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
10.02.2017 Claims Search / examination 2
10.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.02.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.01.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
22.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.08.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
22.08.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.08.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
25.05.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
12.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.05.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
12.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
12.05.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
12.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.12.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
03.11.2015 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
30.10.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.10.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.10.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.10.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.10.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.10.2015 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 4
01.10.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
29.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
29.09.2015 Certificate of deposit of biological material Search / examination 3
29.09.2015 Certificate of deposit of biological material Search / examination 3
29.09.2015 Certificate of deposit of biological material Search / examination 3
29.09.2015 Certificate of deposit of biological material Search / examination 3
29.09.2015 Certificate of deposit of biological material Search / examination 3
29.09.2015 Certificate of deposit of biological material Search / examination 3
29.09.2015 Certificate of deposit of biological material Search / examination 3
29.09.2015 Certificate of deposit of biological material Search / examination 3
29.09.2015 Certificate of deposit of biological material Search / examination 3
29.09.2015 Certificate of deposit of biological material Search / examination 3
29.09.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 9
22.07.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
05.11.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
05.11.2014 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
08.10.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 45
08.10.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 41
22.09.2014 Letter concerning biological material Search / examination 1
18.09.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
18.09.2014 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 31
29.07.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
29.07.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
29.07.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
09.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt International Searching Authority 1
12.06.2014 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable PCT receiving Office 1
10.06.2014 Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) International Searching Authority 1
14.04.2014 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable PCT receiving Office 1
14.04.2014 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
14.04.2014 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
17.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
17.03.2014 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
17.03.2014 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
17.03.2014 Description PCT receiving Office 25
17.03.2014 Document concerning representation PCT receiving Office 1
17.03.2014 Drawings PCT receiving Office 2
17.03.2014 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 40