blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2966992


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.06.2019 Deletion: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
27.03.2019 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
08.03.2019 Opposition filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
16.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
02.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.12.2018  [2018/49]
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
05.05.2018 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
04.05.2018 (Expected) grant published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
02.05.2018 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
02.05.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.02.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
02.02.2018 Change - divisional application(s) published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
02.02.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
02.02.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
21.12.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.11.2017 Change - French title published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
14.11.2017 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
21.05.2017 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
29.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.02.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
03.01.2017 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
31.08.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
19.08.2016 First examination report
20.05.2016 Change - extension states published on  22.06.2016  [2016/25]
13.05.2016 Amendment by applicant
30.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.12.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  20.01.2016  [2016/03]
18.12.2015 Request for examination filed published on  20.01.2016  [2016/03]
18.11.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
26.10.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
01.10.2015 Change - representative
01.10.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
01.10.2015 New entry: Biological material
08.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
25.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication