blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2966992 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP14712250 EP18154467



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10344273Global Dossier 09.07.2019B2
US2015376639 31.12.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2014EP55338 17.03.2014
US201313836277 15.03.2013
US201514850457 10.09.2015
EP13159494 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9351473Global Dossier 31.05.2016B2
US2014283223 18.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313836277 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3335547Global Dossier 20.06.2018A1
Priority number Date
EP14712250 17.03.2014
US201313836277 15.03.2013
EP13159494 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2966992Global Dossier 06.06.2018B1
EP2966992 20.01.2016A1
Priority number Date
EP14712250 17.03.2014
WO2014EP55338 17.03.2014
US201313836277 15.03.2013
EP13159494 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2014229953 21.01.2016A1
Priority number Date
WO2014EP55338 17.03.2014
US201313836277 15.03.2013
EP13159494 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2686143T 16.10.2018T3
Priority number Date
WO2014EP55338 17.03.2014
US201313836277 15.03.2013
EP13159494 15.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014140378Global Dossier 18.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313836277 15.03.2013
EP13159494 15.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TR201812441T 21.09.2018T4
Priority number Date
US201313836277 15.03.2013
EP13159494 15.03.2013
TypeType Divisional application
 EP3335547