Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2966992

EP2966992 - HIGH TEMPERATURE GERMINATING LETTUCE SEEDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.05.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.12.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rijk Zwaan Zaadteelt en Zaadhandel B.V.
Burgemeester Crezeelaan 40
2678 KX De Lier / NL
[2016/03]
Inventor(s)01 / WOUDENBERG, Leendert Jacobus
Jean Monnetring 76
3137 DC Vlaardingen / NL
02 / COPPOOLSE, Eric Roland
Burg. Breebaartlaan 9
3171 CC Poortugaal / NL
03 / LENSSEN, Gerardus Maria
Scheepmakersingel 56
2645 LC Delfgauw / NL
04 / SCHUT, Johannes Wilhelmus
Markiezenstraat 48
4724 BC Wouw / NL
05 / SMITS, Egbert Carolus Johannes
De Meekrap 7
4761 XV Steenbergen / NL
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)van Someren, Petronella F. H. M. , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[2016/03]
Application number, filing date14712250.117.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014EP55338
Priority number, dateEP2013015949415.03.2013         Original published format: EP 13159494
US20131383627715.03.2013         Original published format: US201313836277
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014140378
Date:18.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2966992
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014
[2016/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2966992
Date:06.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:A01H5/10, A01H5/12
[2016/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BEI HOHER TEMPERATUR KEIMENDE BLATTSALATSAMEN[2016/03]
English:HIGH TEMPERATURE GERMINATING LETTUCE SEEDS[2016/03]
French:GRAINES DE LAITUE À GERMINATION À HAUTE TEMPÉRATURE[2017/51]
Former [2016/03]GRAINES DE LAITUE GERMANT À HAUTE TEMPÉRATURE
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase29.09.2015National basic fee paid 
29.09.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
29.09.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.09.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
12.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.11.2017
21.11.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
22.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.01.2018Fee for grant paid
31.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18154467.7  / EP3335547
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.08.2016
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.03.2019   
"Keine Patente auf Saatgut!" e.V.
Frohschammerstr. 14
80807 München / DE
 [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201805   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2018
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
DK06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
MC06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SI06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
[2019/46]
Former [2019/26]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
DK06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SI06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/11]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/10]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/09]CY06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/08]CY06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2018/52]CY06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
Former [2018/51]CY06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
Former [2018/50]CY06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
Former [2018/49]CY06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
Former [2018/47]FI06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
NO06.09.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]  - JASON ARGYRIS ET AL, "A gene encoding an abscisic acid biosynthetic enzyme (LsNCED4) collocates with the high temperature germination locusin lettuce (sp.)", THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS ; INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PLANT BREEDING RESEARCH, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20100812), vol. 122, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S00122-010-1425-3, ISSN 1432-2242, pages 95 - 108, XP019869617 [A] 1-17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00122-010-1425-3
 [A]  - J. ARGYRIS ET AL, "Genetic Variation for Lettuce Seed Thermoinhibition Is Associated with Temperature-Sensitive Expression of Abscisic Acid, Gibberellin, and Ethylene Biosynthesis, Metabolism, and Response Genes", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (20080808), vol. 148, no. 2, doi:10.1104/pp.108.125807, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 926 - 947, XP055070719 [A] 1-4 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.108.125807
 [A]  - ANDRES R SCHWEMBER ET AL, "A genetic locus and gene expression patterns associated with the priming effect on lettuce seed germination at elevated temperatures", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DORDRECHT, NL, (20100103), vol. 73, no. 1-2, ISSN 1573-5028, pages 105 - 118, XP019794086 [A] 1-17 * the whole document *
 [A]  - TINGTING DONG ET AL, "Nitrate, abscisic acid and gibberellin interactions on the thermoinhibition of lettuce seed germination", PLANT GROWTH REGULATION, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20111204), vol. 66, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S10725-011-9643-5, ISSN 1573-5087, pages 191 - 202, XP035013195 [A] 1-17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10725-011-9643-5
Opposition   - ARGYRIS J. et al., "A gene encoding an abscisic acid biosynthetic enzyme (LsNCED4) collocates with the high temperature germination locusin lettuce (sp.)", Theor Appl Genet, (20110000), vol. 122, pages 95 - 108, XP019869617

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00122-010-1425-3
    - ARGYRIS J. et al., "Genetic Variation for Lettuce Seed Thermoinhibition Is Associated with Temperature-Sensitive Expression of Abscisic Acid, Gibberellin, and Ethylene Biosynthesis, Metabolism, and Response Genes", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (20080000), vol. 148, no. 2, pages 926 - 947, XP055070719

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.108.125807
    - CHANDLER C.H. et al., "Does your gene need a background check? How genetic background impacts the analysis of mutations, genes, and evolution", Trends in Genetics, (20130000), vol. 29, no. 6, pages 358 - 364, XP055574263

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tig.2013.01.009
    - SCHWEMBER A. R. et al., "A genetic locus and gene expression patterns associated with the priming effect on lettuce seed germination at elevated teniperatures", Plant Mol Biol ., (20100000), vol. 73, pages 105 - 118, XP019794086
    - YOONG F.-Y. et al., "Genetic Variation for Thermotolerance in Lettuce Seed Germination Is Associated with Temperature-Sensitive Regulation of ETHYLENE RESPONSE FACTOR1 (ERF1)", Plant Physiology, (20160000), vol. 170, pages 472 - 488, XP055574269

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.15.01251