Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2967881

EP2967881 - ADJUSTABLE LATERAL ARTICULATING CONDYLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
56 East Bell Drive
Warsaw, IN 46582 / US
[2016/03]
Inventor(s)01 / WINSLOW, Nathan A.
2677 Lake Tahoe Trail
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2016/03]
Application number, filing date14712538.907.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US21970
Priority number, dateUS20131380074013.03.2013         Original published format: US201313800740
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014159108
Date:02.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2967881
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014
[2016/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2967881
Date:01.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/38
[2016/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINSTELLBARER SEITLICHER KONDYLUS[2016/03]
English:ADJUSTABLE LATERAL ARTICULATING CONDYLE[2016/03]
French:CONDYLE D'ARTICULATION LATÉRALE RÉGLABLE[2016/03]
Entry into regional phase13.10.2015National basic fee paid 
13.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
13.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
11.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.2016Fee for grant paid
20.12.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.12.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.08.2016
Opposition(s)03.11.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.03.2014
AT01.02.2017
CY01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
MK01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
LU07.03.2017
MT07.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/47]HU07.03.2014
AT01.02.2017
CY01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
LU07.03.2017
MT07.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2019/31]HU07.03.2014
AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
LU07.03.2017
MT07.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2018/43]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
LU07.03.2017
MT07.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2018/24]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
LU07.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2018/14]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
LU07.03.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2018/10]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
LU07.03.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/51]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/50]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/49]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/48]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/41]AT01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Cited inInternational search[X]US2010222887  (KATRANA NICHOLAS J [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,5,9 * paragraph [0131] * * paragraph [0175] - paragraph [0182] * * paragraph [0186] - paragraph [0193] * * figures 8,36-39 *;
 [X]DE3940728  (GMT MEDIZINISCHE TECHNIK GMBH [DE]; LINK WALDEMAR GMBH CO [DE] LINK WA) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2002165614  (TORNIER ALAIN [FR]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0059] * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4383337  (VOLZ ROBERT G ET AL) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 7 *