Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3111703

EP3111703 - METHOD FOR POWER CONSUMPTION OPTIMIZATION IN MOBILE CELLULAR NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Database last updated on 19.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2017Change - extension statespublished on 07.06.2017  [2017/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via Gaetano Negri, 1
20123 Milano / IT
[2017/01]
Inventor(s)01 / CARETTI, Marco
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via G. Reiss Romoli 274
I-10148 Torino / IT
02 / SABELLA, Dario
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via G. Reiss Romoli 274
I-10148 Torino / IT
03 / STEA, Giovanni
Università di Pisa - Dipartimento di Ingegneria
dell'Informazione
Via Caruso 16
I-56122 Pisa / IT
04 / VIRDIS, Antonio
Università di Pisa - Dipartimento di Ingegneria
dell'Informazione
Via Caruso 16
I-56122 Pisa / IT
 [2017/01]
Representative(s)Maccalli, Marco , et al
Maccalli & Pezzoli S.r.l.
Via Settembrini, 40
20124 Milano / IT
[2017/01]
Application number, filing date14712610.628.02.2014
[2017/01]
WO2014EP53954
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015127988
Date:03.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3111703
Date:04.01.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2015
[2017/01]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
EP03.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W52/02, H04W24/02
[2017/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR STROMVERBRAUCHSOPTIMIERUNG IN MOBILEN ZELLULAREN NETZWERKEN[2017/01]
English:METHOD FOR POWER CONSUMPTION OPTIMIZATION IN MOBILE CELLULAR NETWORKS[2017/01]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'OPTIMISATION DE LA CONSOMMATION DE PUISSANCE DANS DES RÉSEAUX CELLULAIRES MOBILES[2017/01]
Entry into regional phase21.09.2016National basic fee paid 
21.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.09.2016Examination requested  [2017/01]
21.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XI]GB2501718  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,7,10-15 * abstract * * pages 6,9-20 * [I] 2,4-6,8,9;
 [A]US2013223317  (KUDO SHUNSUKE [JP]) [A] 1,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0149] - [0151] *;
 [A]WO2011138351  (KONINKL KPN NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,11 * abstract * * pages 3,15-19 *;
 [AD]WO2012167817  (TELECOM ITALIA SPA [IT], et al) [AD] 1,11 * abstract * * pages 9-15 *;
 [AD]US2012157002  (CHOI JIN HYEOCK [KR]) [AD] 1,11 * abstract *