Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3111703

EP3111703 - METHOD FOR POWER CONSUMPTION OPTIMIZATION IN MOBILE CELLULAR NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.09.2018
Database last updated on 09.11.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.05.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2018(Expected) grantpublished on 17.10.2018  [2018/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via Gaetano Negri, 1
20123 Milano / IT
[2017/01]
Inventor(s)01 / CARETTI, Marco
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via G. Reiss Romoli 274
I-10148 Torino / IT
02 / SABELLA, Dario
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via G. Reiss Romoli 274
I-10148 Torino / IT
03 / STEA, Giovanni
Università di Pisa - Dipartimento di Ingegneria
dell'Informazione
Via Caruso 16
I-56122 Pisa / IT
04 / VIRDIS, Antonio
Università di Pisa - Dipartimento di Ingegneria
dell'Informazione
Via Caruso 16
I-56122 Pisa / IT
 [2017/01]
Representative(s)Maccalli, Marco , et al
Maccalli & Pezzoli S.r.l.
Via Settembrini, 40
20124 Milano / IT
[2017/01]
Application number, filing date14712610.628.02.2014
[2017/01]
WO2014EP53954
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015127988
Date:03.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3111703
Date:04.01.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2015
[2017/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3111703
Date:17.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W52/02
[2018/22]
Former International [2017/01]H04W52/02, H04W24/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR STROMVERBRAUCHSOPTIMIERUNG IN MOBILEN ZELLULAREN NETZWERKEN[2017/01]
English:METHOD FOR POWER CONSUMPTION OPTIMIZATION IN MOBILE CELLULAR NETWORKS[2017/01]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'OPTIMISATION DE LA CONSOMMATION DE PUISSANCE DANS DES RÉSEAUX CELLULAIRES MOBILES[2017/01]
Entry into regional phase21.09.2016National basic fee paid 
21.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.09.2016Examination requested  [2017/01]
21.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.09.2018Fee for grant paid
06.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.05.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]GB2501718  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,7,10-15 * abstract * * pages 6,9-20 * [I] 2,4-6,8,9;
 [A]US2013223317  (KUDO SHUNSUKE [JP]) [A] 1,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0149] - [0151] *;
 [A]WO2011138351  (KONINKL KPN NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,11 * abstract * * pages 3,15-19 *;
 [AD]WO2012167817  (TELECOM ITALIA SPA [IT], et al) [AD] 1,11 * abstract * * pages 9-15 *;
 [AD]US2012157002  (CHOI JIN HYEOCK [KR]) [AD] 1,11 * abstract *