Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2974492

EP2974492 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ALLOCATION OF RESOURCES FOR THE TRANSMISSION OF PILOT SIGNALS BY SMALL BASE STATIONS OR UE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/03]METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR ALLOCATION OF RESOURCES FOR THE TRANSMISSION OF PILOT SIGNALS BY SMALL BASE STATIONS OR UE DEVICES
[2016/31]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.04.2017
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.05.2017  [2017/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
Attn: International IP Administration
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2016/03]
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Junyi
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / KHUDE, Nilesh, Nilkanth
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / PARK, Vincent, Douglas
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / TAVILDAR, Saurabha, Rangrao
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/03]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date14713691.506.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US21053
Priority number, dateUS20131382842014.03.2013         Original published format: US201313828420
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014158948
Date:02.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2974492
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014
[2016/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W52/02, H04L5/00, // H04W84/04
[2016/31]
Former International [2016/03]H04W72/04, H04W52/02, H04W84/04, H04W48/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZUTEILUNG VON RESSOURCEN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON PILOTSIGNALEN DURCH KLEINE BASISSTATIONEN ODER BENUTZERVORRICHTUNGEN[2016/03]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ALLOCATION OF RESOURCES FOR THE TRANSMISSION OF PILOT SIGNALS BY SMALL BASE STATIONS OR UE DEVICES[2016/31]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR L'ALLOCATION DE RESSOURCES POUR L'ÉMISSION DE SIGNAUX PILOTES PAR DE PETITES STATIONS DE BASE OU DISPOSITIFS D'UE[2016/31]
Former [2016/03]METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR ALLOCATION OF RESOURCES FOR THE TRANSMISSION OF PILOT SIGNALS BY SMALL BASE STATIONS OR UE DEVICES
Former [2016/03]PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR L'ALLOCATION DE RESSOURCES POUR L'ÉMISSION DE SIGNAUX PILOTES PAR DE PETITES STATIONS DE BASE OU DISPOSITIFS D'UE
Entry into regional phase07.08.2015National basic fee paid 
07.08.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
07.08.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.11.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.08.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
15.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.11.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/21]
10.01.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2017/21]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.07.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2010165882  (PALANKI RAVI [US] ET AL) [X] 1,7,12,15,16,22,27,30,31,38,43,45 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0079] * [I] 2-4,8-10,13,17-21,23-26,28,29,32-37,39-42,44;
 [A]  - "LTE; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Physical layer procedures (3GPP TS 36.213 version 10.2.0 Release 10)", TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, (20110601), vol. 3GPP RAN 1, no. V10.2.0, XP014066384 [A] 1-45 * page 75 *
 [A]  - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Mechanisms for efficient small cell operation", vol. RAN WG1, no. St. Julian, Malta; 20130128 - 20130201, (20130119), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-130595 MECHANISMS FOR EFFICIENT SMALL CELL OPERATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FR, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_72/Docs/, (20130119), XP050663851 [A] 1-45 * section 2.2 *
 [A]  - MEDIATEK INC, "Methods for Efficient Discovery of Small Cells", vol. RAN WG1, no. St Julian; 20130128 - 20130201, (20130119), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-130225_V3, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_72/Docs/, (20130119), XP050663605 [A] 1-45 * section 2 *