Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2989254

EP2989254 - STRUCTURAL SLIDING BEARING AND DIMENSIONING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.04.2017
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2019Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Maurer Söhne Engineering GmbH & Co. KG
Frankfurter Ring 193
80807 München / DE
[2016/09]
Inventor(s)01 / BRAUN, Christian
Buchenstr. 19a
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
02 / DISTL, Johann
Säulenstr. 55
82008 Unterhaching / DE
 [2016/09]
Representative(s)von Hirschhausen, Helge
Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Straße 14
80335 München / DE
[2016/09]
Application number, filing date14714244.228.03.2014
[2016/09]
WO2014EP56255
Priority number, dateDE20131010416124.04.2013         Original published format: DE102013104161
[2016/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014173622
Date:30.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2989254
Date:02.03.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2014
[2016/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2989254
Date:10.05.2017
Language:DE
[2017/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:E01D19/04, E04B1/36, E04H9/02
[2016/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BAUWERKS-GLEITLAGER UND BEMESSUNGSVERFAHREN[2016/09]
English:STRUCTURAL SLIDING BEARING AND DIMENSIONING METHOD[2016/09]
French:DISPOSITIF D'APPUI COULISSANT POUR OUVRAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DIMENSIONNEMENT[2016/09]
Entry into regional phase24.11.2015National basic fee paid 
24.11.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
24.11.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.11.2015Examination requested  [2016/09]
29.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2017Fee for grant paid
29.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
16.04.2018Request for decision received: Opposition is deemed not to be filed
15.02.2019Result of request for decision (Opposition is deemed not to be filed): Request rejected
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.11.2016
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.02.2018   
Mageba S.A.
Solistrasse 68
8180 Bülach / CH
Opponents representative
Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b
82319 Starnberg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2018/12]
Opponent(s)01  10.02.2018   
Mageba S.A.
Solistrasse 68
8180 Bülach / CH
Opponents representative
Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b
82319 Starnberg / DE
05.03.2018Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Opposition is deemed not to be filed 01
Appeal following opposition08.04.2019Appeal received No.  T1158/19
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MC10.05.2017
MT10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
GB28.03.2018
IE28.03.2018
LU28.03.2018
BE31.03.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/09]CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MC10.05.2017
MT10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
IE28.03.2018
LU28.03.2018
Former [2019/04]CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MC10.05.2017
MT10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
LU28.03.2018
Former [2018/52]CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MC10.05.2017
MT10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/43]CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MT10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/25]CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/11]CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/10]CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/09]DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2017/52]FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2017/50]FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2017/49]FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
NO10.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Cited inInternational search[XAI]WO2009010487  (CVI ENGINEERING S R L [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8-11,14,16,17 * the whole document * [A] 3-5,18-23 [I] 7,12,13,15;
 [XAI]JP2007016905  (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [X] 1,2,7-11,13,16,17 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0013] , [0014] * [A] 3-5,18-23 [I] 12,14,15;
 [A]EP0126633  (DIXON INTERNATIONAL LTD [GB]) [A] 7-17 * figures 14-16 * * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 2 *
OppositionGB1239691
    - "Lager im Bauwesen - Teil 2: Gleitteile", DIN EN 1337-2:2004-07, (20040700), XP055465767
    - "Lager im Bauwesen-Teil 1: Allgemeine Regelungen", DIN EN 1337-1:2001-02, (20010200), XP055465741
    - "Lager im Bauwesen - Teil 7: Kalotten- und Zylinderlager mit PTFE", Deutsche Fassung EN 1337-7:2004, (20040800), XP055465756