blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2978523


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.08.2019 Change - representative
22.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.03.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.06.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
07.04.2017 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
27.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.12.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.12.2016 First examination report
20.05.2016 Change - representative
04.05.2016 Amendment by applicant
06.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.02.2016 Change - inventor
01.01.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.02.2016  [2016/05]
01.01.2016 Request for examination filed published on  03.02.2016  [2016/05]
26.10.2015 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
13.10.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
12.10.2015 Amendment by applicant
10.10.2015 Change - representative
10.10.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
22.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
08.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
09.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication