Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2978523

EP2978523 - GRANULAR MATERIAL FOR ABSORPTION OF HARMFUL GASES AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.08.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fels-Werke GmbH
Geheimrat-Ebert-Strasse 12
38640 Goslar / DE
[2016/05]
Inventor(s)01 / BOENKENDORF, Ulf
Soltgrund 4
31188 Holle / DE
02 / STUMPF, Thomas
Rudolf-Huch-Strasse 5A
38667 Bad Harzburg / DE
03 / HAASE, Christina
Ernst-Thälmann-Str. 9a
38855 Nordharz / DE
04 / MEHLING, Christine
Am Gönnenicht 18
38871 Abbenrode / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/05]01 / BOENKENDORF, Ulf
Soltgrund 4
31188 Holle / DE
02 / STUMPF, Thomas
Rudolf-Huch-Strasse 5A
38667 Bad Harzburg / DE
03 / LANGE, Christina
Heidebreite 13
38855 Wernigerode / DE
04 / MEHLING, Christine
Am Gönnenicht 18
38871 Abbenrode / DE
Representative(s)Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/05]Solf, Annkathrin
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Dr. Solf & Zapf
Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date14714256.628.03.2014
[2016/05]
WO2014EP56321
Priority number, dateDE2013100549728.03.2013         Original published format: DE102013005497
[2016/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014154876
Date:02.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2978523
Date:03.02.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014
[2016/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:B01J20/04, B01D53/02, B01J20/30, B01J20/28
[2016/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/05]
Extension statesBA20.10.2015
ME20.10.2015
TitleGerman:GRANULAT ZUR ABSORPTION VON SCHADGASEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG[2016/05]
English:GRANULAR MATERIAL FOR ABSORPTION OF HARMFUL GASES AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF[2016/05]
French:GRANULAT SERVANT À ABSORBER DES GAZ NOCIFS ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DUDIT GRANULAT[2016/05]
Entry into regional phase09.10.2015National basic fee paid 
09.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
09.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.07.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/05]
03.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.12.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
19.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2011039034  (SCHLICHT TORSTEN [GB], et al) [X] 1-9,11,12,14-18,25 * page 12, line 25 - page 13, line 36; table 1 * * claims 18, 19 * * abstract * [Y] 19-24;
 [X]EP0748766  (RHEINISCHE KALKSTEINWERKE [DE]) [X] 1-9,11,12,14-18,25 * column 3, line 11 - line 27 * * column 1, line 20 - line 22; claim 5 *;
 [X]WO2013034314  (FELS WERKE GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-18,25 * page 7 - page 10; tables 1,2 *;
 [Y]EP0487913  (WALHALLA KALK ENTWICKLUNGS UND [DE]) [Y] 19-24 * column 4, line 9 - line 20; claims 6,11 *
by applicantDE102009045278
 DE102011112657
 DE102011113034