Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2968412

EP2968412 - TREATMENT OF PERIPHERAL VASCULAR DISEASE USING PROTEIN SOLUTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.10.2018
Database last updated on 21.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet Biologics, LLC
56 East Bell Drive
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
[2016/03]
Inventor(s)01 / LANDRIGAN, Matthew D.
2412 W. Harbourside Drive
Fort Wayne, Indiana 46814 / US
02 / O'SHAUGHNESSEY, Krista
137 Ems B27 Lane
Pierceton, Indiana 46562 / US
03 / WODDELL-MAY, Jennifer E.
218 E. Dellview Drive
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
04 / SUTER, David L.
3620 Blue Heron Lane
Rochester Hills, Michigan 48309 / US
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Handley, Matthew Edward , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/03]Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date14714491.907.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US21707
Priority number, dateUS20131384110315.03.2013         Original published format: US201313841103
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014149979
Date:25.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2968412
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014
[2016/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.09.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K35/14, A61K38/17, A61P9/10
[2016/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
TitleGerman:BEHANDLUNG VON PERIPHEREN GEFÄSSERKRANKUNGEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON PROTEINLÖSUNGEN[2016/03]
English:TREATMENT OF PERIPHERAL VASCULAR DISEASE USING PROTEIN SOLUTIONS[2016/03]
French:TRAITEMENT D'UNE MALADIE VASCULAIRE PÉRIPHÉRIQUE EN UTILISANT DES SOLUTIONS DE PROTÉINES[2016/03]
Entry into regional phase14.10.2015National basic fee paid 
14.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
14.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
01.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2017/13]
28.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.06.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/47]
16.07.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/47]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.02.2017
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
16.10.2017Request for further processing filed
16.10.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.10.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2010055087  (HIGGINS JOEL C [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * page 3, paragraph [0028]; claims 1-23 *;
 [Y]US2009220482  (HIGGINS JOEL C [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * * claims 15, 23, 25 * * page 5, column r, paragraph [52] *;
 [Y]WO2012030593  (BIOMET BIOLOGICS LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2007027082  (HASTY KAREN A [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * * page 5, paragraph [55] * * claims 6-17 *;
 [Y]US2006171948  (WEINSTEIN STEVEN P [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * * claims 1, 2, 12, 19 * * page 4, paragraphs [45], [46], [47] - page 5 *;
 [Y]WO03080104  (APPLIED RESEARCH SYSTEMS [NL], et al) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * * page 21, lines 11-14 * * claim 1 *
 [Y]  - O'SHAUGHNESSEY KRISTA M ET AL, "Blood-derived anti-inflammatory protein solution blocks the effect of IL-1 beta on human macrophages in vitro", IMFLAMMATION RESEARCH, BIRKHAEUSER VERLAG, BASEL, CH, (20111001), vol. 60, no. 10, doi:10.1007/S00011-011-0353-2, ISSN 1023-3830, pages 929 - 936, XP009172125 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00011-011-0353-2
 [Y]  - JENNIFER WOODELL-MAY ET AL, "Autologous protein solution inhibits MMP-13 production by IL-1[beta] and TNF[alpha]-stimulated human articular chondrocytes", JOURNAL OF ORTHOPAEDIC RESEARCH, (20110901), vol. 29, no. 9, doi:10.1002/jor.21384, ISSN 0736-0266, pages 1320 - 1326, XP055013094 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jor.21384
 [Y]  - SORBERA L A, "PEGSUNERCEPT. PEGYLATED SOLUBLE TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR RECEPTOR TYPE 1 PEG-STNF-RI", DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, PROUS SCIENCE, ES, (20030101), vol. 28, no. 12, doi:10.1358/DOF.2003.028.12.772782, ISSN 0377-8282, pages 1182 - 1188, XP009033320 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * * page 1186 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1358/dof.2003.028.12.772782
 [Y]  - FIOTTI N ET AL, "ATHEROSCLEROSIS AND INFLAMMATION. PATTERNS OF CYTOKINE REGULATION IN PATIENTS WITH PERIPHERAL ARTERIAL DISEASE", ATHEROSCLEROSIS, ELSEVIER IRELAND LTD, IE, (19990701), vol. 145, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0021-9150(99)00013-1, ISSN 0021-9150, pages 51 - 60, XP001088733 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 58, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 58, column r, paragraph l *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9150(99)00013-1
 [Y]  - MICHAEL P MURPHY ET AL, "Autologous bone marrow mononuclear cell therapy is safe and promotes amputation-free survival in patients with critical limb ischemia", JOURNAL OF VASCULAR SURGERY, C.V. MOSBY CO., ST. LOUIS, MO, US, vol. 53, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.JVS.2011.01.074, ISSN 0741-5214, (20110128), pages 1565 - 1574.e1, (20110215), XP028217162 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jvs.2011.01.074
 [Y]  - KLINGENBERG ROLAND ET AL, "Treating inflammation in atherosclerotic cardiovascular disease: emerging therapies", EUROPEAN HEART JOURNAL, (200912), vol. 30, no. 23, ISSN 0195-668X, pages 2838 - 2844, XP002723764 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * * page 2840, paragraphs 2-3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/eurheartj/ehp477
by applicantUS7992725
 US5585007
 US6398972
 US6649072
 US6790371
 US7011852
 US7179391
 US7374678
 US7223346
 US7708152
 US7806276
 US8048297
 US2006278588
 US2009220482
 US2010055087
 US2011052561
 US2012030593
 US2012172836
 US7553413
 US7694828
 US7845499
 US6599873
 US5075222
 US2005197293
 US6623472
 US6713246
 US6759188
 US6337072
 US2001053764
    - WOODELL-MAY JE; RIDDERMAN DN; SWIFT MJ; HIGGINS J, "Producing Accurate Platelet Counts for Platelet Rich Plasma: Validation of a Hematology Analyzer and Preparation Techniques for Counting", J. CRANIOFAC. SURG., (200509), vol. 16, no. 5, pages 749 - 56